California Central District Court
Judge:S James Otero
Referred: Victor B Kenton
Case #: 2:14-cv-02154
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2014
Terminated:Jun 11, 2014
Last checked: Thursday Dec 11, 2014 4:38 AM PST
Defendant
Phillips & Cohen Associates, LTD.
Plaintiff
Alexander Monge
Represented By
Nicholas J Bontrager
Martin And Brontrager Apc
contact info
Arvin Ratanavongse
The Law Offices Of Todd M Friedman PC
contact info
Asaf Agazanof
Asaf Law
contact info
Todd M Friedman
Law Offices Of Todd M Friedman PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, June 11, 2014
17 17 ORDER pursuant to the15 Stipulation the individual claims are dismissed with prejudice and the putative class claims are dismissed without prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A). Each party shall bear their own costs and fees. by Judge S. James Otero15 . (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 06, 2014
16 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Settlement15 . pdf is a notice of dismissal (with a proposed order submitted as an attachment). The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notice of voluntary dismissal of case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 05, 2014
15 15 NOTICE of Settlement Alexander Monge.(Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 24, 2014
14 14 ORDER pursuant to Notice of Settlement12 Plaintiff shall file a dismissal on or before June 16, 2014.Pursuant to the Notice of Settlement filed on April 17, 2014, the Order to Show Cause is hereby extended to June 25, 2014 by Judge S. James Otero (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2014
13 13 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,11 , Notice of Settlement12(Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 17, 2014
12 12 NOTICE of Settlement Alexander Monge. (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2014
11 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero: Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause in writing by not later than April 23, 2014 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The court will consider the filing of the following as an appropriate response to this Order to Show Cause, on or before the above date: Answer by the Defendant(s) or Plaintiff's request for entry of default. No oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2014
10 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Alexander Monge, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint9 served on march 31, 2014. (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2014
9 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2014
8 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 08-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer to Judge S. James Otero for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 14-02154 SJO(VBKx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2014
7 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alexander Monge, upon Defendant Phillips & Cohen Associates, LTD. served on 3/21/2014, answer due 4/11/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy Mclaren, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2014
6 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Phillips & Cohen Associates, LTD. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer and Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton. (ghap)
Related: [-]
4 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Alexander Monge. (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
3 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Alexander Monge. (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
2 2 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Alexander Monge, identifying Alex Monge. (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-13548501 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Alexander Monge.(Attorney Todd M Friedman added to party Alexander Monge(pty:pla))(Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]