California Southern District Court
Judge:Marilyn L Huff
Referred: Jan M Adler
Case #: 3:14-cv-00675
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2014
Terminated:Apr 01, 2014
Last checked: Thursday Dec 11, 2014 6:09 AM PST
Defendant
Instant Checkmate, Inc.
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Douglas Keehn
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 01, 2014
5 5 Consent Order. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 03/28/2014. (ag)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2014
4 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Keehn on behalf of United States of America(Keehn, Douglas) (ag).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Tuesday, March 25, 2014
3 3 Joint MOTION for Judgment Consent Motion for Final Judgment by United States of America.(Keehn, Douglas) (ag).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Monday, March 24, 2014
2 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (kcm)(av1).
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Instant Checkmate, Inc., Fee Waived, filed by United States of America. The new case number is 3:14-cv-675-H-JMA. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler are assigned to the case. (Keehn, Douglas)(kcm) (av1).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Case Cover Sheet