Member Case
Lead case is: 4:19-bk-44385

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Edward L Morris
Case #: 4:19-bk-44386
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2019
Terminated:Jun 01, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Robinson Aircraft Interiors, Inc.
13901 Aviator Way
Fort Worth, TX 76177
Represented By
Melissa S. Hayward
Hayward & Associates PLLC
contact info
Last checked: Thursday May 14, 2020 9:57 AM CDT
Creditor
Dallas County
Linbarger, Goggan, Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Laurie A. Spindler 2777 N Stemmons Frwy, No 1000
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Laurie A. Spindler
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
First State Bank Athens
Ritcheson, Lauffer & Vincent, P.C. 821 ESE Loop 323, Ste. 530
Tyler, TX 75701
Represented By
Scott A. Ritcheson
Ritcheson, Lauffer & Vincent, P.C
contact info
Creditor
Northwest ISD
Linebarger, Goggan, Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Laurie A. Spindler 2777 N. Stemmons Fwy Suite 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Laurie A. Spindler
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Strom Aviation, Inc.
Strom Aviation, Inc. 3575 Lone Star Circle, Suite 110
Fort Worth, TX 76177
Represented By
Robert F. Maris
Maris & Lanier, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Tarrant County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Laurie A. Spindler 2777 N. Stemmons Fwy Suite 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Laurie A. Spindler
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
E. Stuart Phillips c/o Sherri K. Simpson, Paralegal P.O. Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711
Represented By
E. Stuart Phillips
Texas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, June 01, 2020
court Close bankruptcy case Mon 06/01 10:56 AM
Bankruptcy case closed. (Spelmon, T)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 17, 2020
34 34 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Sun 05/17 11:23 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 75. Notice Date 05/17/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 33 Agreed Order dismissing Debtor without prejudice. Entered on 5/15/2020
Friday, May 15, 2020
33 33 3 pgs order Dismiss case Fri 05/15 2:32 PM
Agreed Order dismissing Debtor without prejudice. Entered on 5/15/2020 (Munoz, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 02, 2020
32 32 9 pgs misc Operating report Thu 04/02 8:59 AM
Debtor-in-possession monthly operating report for filing period February 1, 2020 to February 29, 2020 filed by Debtor Robinson Aircraft Interiors, Inc.. (Hayward, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 06, 2020
31 31 2 pgs notice Notice of change of address Fri 03/06 10:46 AM
Notice of change of address filed by Creditor Strom Aviation, Inc.. (Maris, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 04, 2020
30 30 9 pgs misc Operating report Wed 03/04 4:37 PM
Debtor-in-possession monthly operating report for filing period January 1, 2020 to January 31, 2020 filed by Debtor Robinson Aircraft Interiors, Inc.. (Hayward, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
29 29 misc Operating report Wed 01/22 10:52 AM
Debtor-in-possession monthly operating report for filing period December 1, 2019 to December 31, 2019 filed by Debtor Robinson Aircraft Interiors, Inc.. (Hayward, Melissa)
Related: [-]
28 28 10 pgs misc Operating report Wed 01/22 10:51 AM
Debtor-in-possession monthly operating report for filing period November 1, 2019 to November 30, 2019 filed by Debtor Robinson Aircraft Interiors, Inc.. (Hayward, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2019
27 27 1 pgs court Clerk's correspondence Fri 12/20 1:16 PM
Clerk's correspondence requesting an order from attorney for debtor. Related [+] Responses due by 12/30/2019. (Spelmon, T)
Related: [-] 8 Application to employ Hayward & Associates PLLC as Attorney Filed by Debtor Robinson Aircraft Interiors, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Melissa S. Hayward # 2 Proposed Order),10 Motion regarding utilities. Filed by Debtor Robinson Aircraft Interiors, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Proposed Order)
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
26 26 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Tue 12/17 3:46 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Robert F. Maris filed by Creditor Strom Aviation, Inc.. (Maris, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2019
24 24 3 pgs notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Thu 12/05 11:19 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Scott A. Ritcheson filed by Creditor First State Bank Athens. (Ritcheson, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2019
23 23 1 pgs misc Equity security holders Mon 12/02 11:55 PM
List of equity security holders filed by Debtor Robinson Aircraft Interiors, Inc.. (Hayward, Melissa)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Disclosure of compensation of attorney for debtor Mon 12/02 11:55 PM
Disclosure of compensation of attorney for debtor . Filed by Debtor Robinson Aircraft Interiors, Inc.. (Hayward, Melissa)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for a Non-individual Mon 12/02 11:54 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors. Filed by Debtor Robinson Aircraft Interiors, Inc.. (Hayward, Melissa)
Related: [-]
20 20 37 pgs misc Statement of financial affairs Mon 12/02 11:54 PM
Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual . Filed by Debtor Robinson Aircraft Interiors, Inc. Related [+]. (Hayward, Melissa)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of deficiency
19 19 40 pgs misc Schedules Mon 12/02 11:53 PM
Schedules: Schedules A/B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities. Filed by Debtor Robinson Aircraft Interiors, Inc. Related [+]. (Hayward, Melissa)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of deficiency
Friday, November 15, 2019
18 18 order Extend/Shorten time Fri 11/15 11:43 AM
Order granting16 Motion to extend time. Related [+] Schedule A/B due 12/2/2019 for2 , Schedule D due 12/2/2019 for2 , Schedule E/F due 12/2/2019 for2 , Schedule G due 12/2/2019 for2 , Schedule H due 12/2/2019 for2 , Statement of Financial Affairs due 12/2/2019 for2 , Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 12/2/2019 for2 , Entered on 11/15/2019. (Cumby, C)
Related: [-] related document(s)2 Notice of deficiency
Thursday, November 14, 2019
17 17 order Joint administration Thu 11/14 12:21 PM
Order granting motion for joint administration lead case 4:19-bk-44385 with member case 4:2019-bk-44386-mxm Related [+]Judge Edward L. Morris assigned. Involvement of Judge Mark X. Mullin terminated (An order has been entered directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the bankruptcy cases of Robinson Aerospace, Inc., Case No. 19-44385 and Robinson Aircraft Interiors, Inc., Case No. 19-44386 in accordance with Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 19-44385 shall be consulted for all matters affecting these cases.) All proof of claims, list, schedules, statements and monthly operating reports shall be filed and docketed in the specific member case for which they are applicable. Entered on 11/14/2019. (Cumby, C)
Related: [-] 9
Monday, November 11, 2019
16 16 motion Extend/Shorten time Mon 11/11 4:25 PM
Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Filed by Debtor Robinson Aircraft Interiors, Inc. (Hayward, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 07, 2019
14 14 misc Certificate of service Thu 11/07 3:28 PM
Certificate of service re: Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Motion for Joint Administration, Application to Employ General Counsel, Motion for Expedited Hearing on First-Day Matters filed by Debtor Robinson Aircraft Interiors, Inc. Related [+]. (Hayward, Melissa)
Related: [-] 3 Meeting of creditors Chapter 11,8 Application to employ Hayward & Associates PLLC as Attorney ,9 Motion for joint administration of cases Robinson Aerospace Inc., Case No. 19-44385 and Robinson Aircraft Interiors Inc., Case No. 19-44386 ,11 Motion for expedited hearing(related documents9 Motion for joint administration,10 First Day Motion)
Att: 1 Service List
Monday, November 04, 2019
13 13 3 pgs misc 20 Largest unsecured creditors Mon 11/04 8:37 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non- Individual List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders . Filed by Debtor Robinson Aircraft Interiors, Inc. Related [+]. (Hayward, Melissa)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of deficiency
12 12 9 pgs misc Matrix Mon 11/04 8:36 PM
Creditor matrix . Filed by Debtor Robinson Aircraft Interiors, Inc. Related [+]. (Hayward, Melissa)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of deficiency
11 11 motion Expedite hearing Mon 11/04 8:10 PM
Motion for expedited hearin Related [+] Filed by Debtor Robinson Aircraft Interiors, Inc. (Hayward, Melissa)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for joint administration,10 First Day Motion
10 10 motion First day motions Mon 11/04 8:10 PM
Motion regarding utilities. Filed by Debtor Robinson Aircraft Interiors, Inc. (Hayward, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
9 9 motion Joint administration Mon 11/04 8:07 PM
Motion for joint administration of cases Robinson Aerospace Inc., Case No. 19-44385 and Robinson Aircraft Interiors Inc., Case No. 19-44386 Filed by Debtor Robinson Aircraft Interiors, Inc. (Hayward, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 motion Employ Mon 11/04 12:34 PM
Application to employ Hayward & Associates PLLC as Attorney Filed by Debtor Robinson Aircraft Interiors, Inc. (Hayward, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Melissa S. Hayward
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Sunday, November 03, 2019
7 7 court BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors Sun 11/03 10:29 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/03/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/13/2019 at 01:00 PM at FTW 341 Rm 7A24. Proofs of Claims due by 3/12/2020. Attorney(s)certificate of service of 341 meeting chapter 11 to be filed by 12/2/2019.
Saturday, November 02, 2019
6 6 court BNC certificate of mailing Sat 11/02 11:24 PM
BNC certificate of mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/02/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 11/13/2019. Schedule D due 11/13/2019. Schedule E/F due 11/13/2019. Schedule G due 11/13/2019. Schedule H due 11/13/2019. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 11/13/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs due 11/13/2019. Creditor matrix due 11/4/2019. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 11/4/2019. (Calfee, J.)
Friday, November 01, 2019
5 5 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Fri 11/01 10:17 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Laurie A. Spindler filed by Dallas County, Tarrant County, Northwest ISD. (Spindler, Laurie)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Fri 11/01 9:09 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by E. Stuart Phillips filed by Creditor Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts. (Phillips, E.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2019
3 3 court Meeting of creditors chapter 11 Thu 10/31 11:21 AM
Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/13/2019 at 01:00 PM at FTW 341 Rm 7A24. Proofs of Claims due by 3/12/2020. Attorney(s)certificate of service of 341 meeting chapter 11 to be filed by 12/2/2019. (Neary, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs court Notice of deficiency Thu 10/31 10:42 AM
Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 11/13/2019. Schedule D due 11/13/2019. Schedule E/F due 11/13/2019. Schedule G due 11/13/2019. Schedule H due 11/13/2019. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 11/13/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs due 11/13/2019. Creditor matrix due 11/4/2019. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 11/4/2019. (Calfee, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2019
1 1 4 pgs misc Voluntary petition ch 11 (attorney filer) Wed 10/30 8:21 AM
Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Robinson Aircraft Interiors, Inc. (Hayward, Melissa)
Related: [-]