Nevada District Court
Case #: 2:19-cr-00248
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2019
Last checked: Thursday Oct 31, 2019 12:46 AM PDT
Defendant
Harolyn Landau (2)
Represented By
Erin M. Gettel
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Brian Pugh, AFPD
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Adam Pacheco (1)
Represented By
Joseph P Wilson
Wilson Tax Law Group, Aplc
contact info
Richard G Stack
contact info
Sunethra Muralidhara
Wright Marsh & Levy
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Daniel Evan Clarkson
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Christopher Burton
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/29/2024 3:39 AM PDT
Tuesday, October 01, 2019
Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (RT)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs INDICTMENT as to Adam Pacheco (1) counts 1 - 14, Harolyn Landau (2) counts 1 - 14. (ADR)
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 to1 Indictment as to Adam Pacheco. (ADR)
Related: [-]
3 3 AO 257 to1 Indictment as to Harolyn Landau. (ADR)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER Sealing Indictment as to Adam Pacheco, Harolyn Landau. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/1/19. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Related: [-]
5 5 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Grand Jury Return as to Adam Pacheco, Harolyn Landau held on 10/1/2019 before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Crtrm Administrator: Araceli Bareng ; AUSA: Chris Burton ; Court Reporter/Recorder: Bonnie Terry ; Time of Hearing: 1:04 - 1:07 p.m. ; Courtroom: 3B ; Warrant to issue. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Related: [-]