Rahe et al v. Monsanto Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-07106 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Oct 29, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Iowa Northern, 6:19-cv-02061 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 26, 2020 2:17 AM PDT |
Defendant
Monsanto Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeanne Rahe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Rahe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, November 14, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) |
|
Thursday, October 31, 2019 | ||
utility
MDL Member Case
Thu 10/31 9:47 AM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741-VC; Northern District of Iowa, 19-02061 Rahe, opened in California Northern District as 19-07106 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 158 cc: JPMDL (wsnS-adi, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, October 30, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Case transferred in from District of Iowa Northern; Case Number 6:19-cv-02061. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, October 17, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Wednesday, September 11, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Case Assigned to Judge Linda R Reade and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. (conflicts checked, none found) (jjh) | ||
Tuesday, September 10, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |