NORTHWEST IMMIGRANT RIGHTS PROJECT, et al v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Randolph D Moss |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-03283 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 31, 2019 |
Case in other court: | USCA, 20-05369 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 28, 2020 4:47 AM EDT |
Amicus
ORGANIZATIONS SERVING IMMIGRANT SURVIVORS OF VIOLENCE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NORTHWEST IMMIGRANT RIGHTS PROJECT
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, February 16, 2024 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 02/16 6:14 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt.113 , it is hereby ORDERED that the case shall remain STAYED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report or a stipulation of dismissal on or before May 14, 2024. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/16/2024. (lcrdm1) |
||
Tuesday, February 13, 2024 | ||
113 | 113
2
pgs
misc
Status Report
Tue 02/13 11:47 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by AYUDA INC, CASA DE MARYLAND INC, NORTHWEST IMMIGRANT RIGHTS PROJECT. (Kirkpatrick, Michael) |