Howard B. Samuels, not individually but solely as v. Integra Healthcare Equipment, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-32406
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-32406
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Janet S Baer |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-00994 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Oct 30, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 16, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Integra Healthcare Equipment, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Howard B. Samuels, not individually but solely as trustee of the CC Care, LLC, et al. Creditor Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago |
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 01/16 8:48 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-994 Closed . (Jernigan, Toni) |
|
Monday, January 13, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding
Mon 01/13 11:28 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Elizabeth L Janczak on behalf of Howard B. Samuels, not individually but solely as trustee of the CC Care, LLC, et al. Creditor Trust. (Janczak, Elizabeth) |
|
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Wed 12/04 11:09 AM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 01/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 615 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 12/04/2019. (Dragonetti, Alex) |
|
Wednesday, October 30, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Wed 10/30 1:23 PM
Receipt of Complaint 19-00994 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40890640. Fee Amount $ 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Wed 10/30 1:19 PM
Summons Issued on Integra Healthcare Equipment, LLC Answer Due 11/29/2019 (Admin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/30 1:19 PM
Adversary case 19-00994 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): Complaint by Howard B. Samuels, not individually but solely as trustee of the CC Care, LLC, et al. Creditor Trust against Integra Healthcare Equipment, LLC. Fee Amount $350. Status hearing to be held on 12/4/2019 at 10:00 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 615, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (DeRousse, Shelly) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Adversary Cover Sheet |