Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:19-bk-51181

Louisiana Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:John W Kolwe
Case #: 4:19-ap-05107
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2019
Terminated:May 15, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Quinton C. Andrus
703 E. Washington Street
Ville Platte, LA 70586
Represented By
Quinton C. Andrus
contact info
Plaintiff
Gulfco of Louisiana, LLC dba Tower Loan of Ville Platte
Rogers, Carter & Payne, LLC 4415 Thornhill Avenue
Shreveport, LA 71106
Represented By
Kevin J. Payne
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Friday, May 15, 2020
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 05/15 8:32 AM
Disposition of Adversary - Granted. Judgment For Plaintiff 19-5107 (melo)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 05/15 8:33 AM
Adversary Case Closed 19-5107 (melo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 03/19 12:05 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 03/18/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Monday, March 16, 2020
11 11 order Default Judgment Mon 03/16 9:58 AM
Order Granting Related [+] (chri)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Gulfco of Louisiana, LLC dba Tower Loan of Ville Platte
Tuesday, March 10, 2020
court Hearing Held - Motion Wed 03/11 7:54 AM
Hearing Held on Related [+] Debtor Absent. Kevin Payne for Tower Loan. RULING: Motion is granted. O-Payne (chri)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Default Judgment
Thursday, January 23, 2020
10 10 notice Hearing Notice Served. (Definite Hearing) Thu 01/23 9:00 AM
Notice of Hearing Served on Related [+] with Certificate of Service . Filed by Kevin J. Payne on behalf of Gulfco of Louisiana, LLC dba Tower Loan of Ville Platte Hearing scheduled for 3/10/2020 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom Five, Lafayette. (Payne, Kevin)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Default Judgment
9 9 motion Default Judgment Thu 01/23 8:52 AM
Motion for Default Judgment with exhibits Filed by Kevin J. Payne on behalf of Gulfco of Louisiana, LLC dba Tower Loan of Ville Platte (Payne, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 28, 2019
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Entry of Default Sat 12/28 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Entry of Default. Related [+]. Notice Date 12/28/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Entry of Default
Thursday, December 26, 2019
7 7 court Entry of Default Thu 12/26 10:01 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default on Quinton C. Andrus (chri)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2019
6 6 motion Default Judgment Request Entry Tue 12/24 8:54 AM
Request for Clerks Entry of Default with Certificate of Service Filed by Kevin J. Payne on behalf of Gulfco of Louisiana, LLC dba Tower Loan of Ville Platte (Payne, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2019
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 11/18 10:21 AM
Summons Service Executed on Quinton C. Andrus 11/18/2019 . (Payne, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2019
4 4 court Summons Issued Wed 11/13 10:01 AM
Summons Issued (1). (laur) Modified text on 11/13/2019 (laur)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2019
3 3 misc Support Document Thu 10/31 1:54 PM
Support Document: to Related [+] Filed by Kevin J. Payne on behalf of Gulfco of Louisiana, LLC dba Tower Loan of Ville Platte (Payne, Kevin)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
2 2 misc Support Document Thu 10/31 9:55 AM
INCORRECT PDF DOCUMENT. ATTORNEY TO REFILE. Support Document: to Related [+] Filed by Kevin J. Payne on behalf of Gulfco of Louisiana, LLC Tower Loan of Ville Platte (Payne, Kevin) Modified on 10/31/2019 (katc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
1 1 cmp Complaint (Fee) Thu 10/31 9:52 AM
Adversary case 19-05107 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)): Complaint to Determine Dischargeability by Gulfco of Louisiana, LLC Tower Loan of Ville Platte (attorney Kevin J. Payne) against Quinton C. Andrus. Fee Amount Due $350 (Payne, Kevin)
Related: [-]