Goldberg v. Oehler
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-12560
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-12560
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50753 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Nov 01, 2019 |
Terminated: | Aug 18, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Eugene Oehler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Goldberg, as Liquidating Trustee of the Woodbridge Liquidation Trust, successor in interest to the estates of Woodbridge Group of Companies, LLC, et al.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, September 03, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding . Filed by Epiq Class Action & Claims Solutions, Inc.. (Gallerie, Bridget) |
|
Tuesday, August 18, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 08/18 12:02 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50753 Closed (SJS) |
||
Monday, August 17, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Notice of Dismissal Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Michael Goldberg (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Wednesday, August 12, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Agenda and Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing on August 5th, 2020 at 9:30 A.M . Filed by Epiq Class Action & Claims Solutions, Inc.. (Garabato, Sid) |
|
Monday, August 03, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing. Filed by Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 8/5/2020 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
15 | 15
![]() Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing. Filed by Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 8/5/2020 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Thursday, July 02, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Affidavit/Declaration of Service Re: Notice of Agenda and Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing on June 24, 2020 at 9:00 A.M. (Prevailing Eastern Time) . Filed by Epiq Class Action & Claims Solutions, Inc.. (Gallerie, Bridget) |
|
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 6/24/2020 at 09:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing. Filed by Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 6/24/2020 at 09:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Wednesday, June 10, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Notice of Agenda and Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing on May 27, 2020 at 10:30 A.M. (Prevailing Eastern Time) . Filed by Epiq Class Action & Claims Solutions, Inc.. (Garabato, Sid) |
|
Tuesday, May 26, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 5/27/2020 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Friday, May 22, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing. Filed by Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 5/27/2020 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Tuesday, April 28, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Affidavit/Declaration of Service RE: [HEARING CANCELLED] Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on April 22, 2020 at 10:30 A.M. (Prevailing Eastern Time) . Filed by Epiq Class Action & Claims Solutions, Inc.. (Garabato, Sid) |
|
Monday, April 20, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Michael Goldberg, Woodbridge Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 4/22/2020 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Wednesday, April 15, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Affidavit/Declaration of Service RE: [CANCELLED HEARING] Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on March 18, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. (Prevailing Eastern Time) Filed by Epiq Class Action & Claims Solutions, Inc.. (Staal, Lorri) |
|
Monday, March 16, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 3/18/2020 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Eugene Oehler. Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/3/2020. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, November 01, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Eugene Oehler. Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 12/31/2019. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Fri 11/01 2:20 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50753 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9511661, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 19-50753 Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Preferential and Fraudulent Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 547, 548 & 550 by Michael Goldberg against Eugene Oehler. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |