Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-04165
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 29, 2020 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
TIMOTHY DIXON
Represented By
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
8 8 2 pgs order Order Wed 10/12 11:55 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/20/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
7 7 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 09/29 3:09 PM
ANSWER to2 Amended Complaint by 3M COMPANY. (SUTHERLAND, KARI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/14 12:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JORDAN LEIGH SCHWINDT on behalf of 3M COMPANY (SCHWINDT, JORDAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/07 11:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARK A DREHER on behalf of All Defendants (DREHER, MARK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/25 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M ROBINSON on behalf of 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (ROBINSON, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/24 12:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by KARI L SUTHERLAND on behalf of All Defendants (SUTHERLAND, KARI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 05, 2020
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 03/05 3:22 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT -SHORT FORM- against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by TIMOTHY DIXON. (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/01 10:13 AM
COMPLAINT -SHORT FORM- against All Defendants, filed by TIMOTHY DIXON. (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 11/06 12:44 PM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON and SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON no longer assigned to case. (djb)
Related: [-]