Township of Barnegat v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45925 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 01, 2019 |
Case in other court: | New Jersey, 3:19-cv-18442 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:37 PM EST |
Defendant
River City Pharma
|
|
Defendant
Keysource Medical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kinray Inc.
|
|
Defendant
MASTERS DRUG COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Moore Medial, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson and Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SHOPRITE SUPERMARKETS
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Top Rx, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
WAKEFERN FOOD CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Company
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Associated Pharmacies Inc
|
|
Defendant
AMERICAN SALES COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Advantage Logistics
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
American Drug Stores
|
|
Defendant
American Drug Stores, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Anda Inc
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cedardale Distributors LLC
|
|
Defendant
Eckerd Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith
|
|
Defendant
Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Henry Schein Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Township of Barnega
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/04/2019 11:55 AM EST |
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 145 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9994249) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BARNEGAT TOWNSHIP.(WRIGHT, WILLIAM) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet JS44 | ||
Monday, September 30, 2019 | ||
Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (km) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.] | ||
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information: List only the Party name, not the address information. If an alias is listed on the complaint, please add to the parties listed on the docket. . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (km) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.] | ||
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The1 Complaint submitted by William Wright on 9/27/2019 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (km) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.] | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. F/K/A WATSON PHARMA, INC., ACTAVIS, LLC, ADVANTAGE LOGISTICS, ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC, ALLERGAN PLC, AMERICAN DRUG STORES, AMERICAN DRUG STORES, INC., AMERICAN SALES COMPANY, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, ANDA, INC., ASSOCIATED PHARMACIES, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., CEDARDALE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC, CVS PHARMACY, ECKERD CORPORATION, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., H.D. SMITH, HARVARD DRUG GROUP, LLC, HENRY SCHEIN, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON AND JOHNSON, KEYSOURCE MEDICAL, KINRAY, INC., MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC, MASTERS DRUG COMPANY, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MOORE MEDICAL, LLC, NORAMCO, INC., ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RITE AID CORP., RIVER CITY PHARMA, ROCHESTER DRUG COOPERATIVE, INC., SHOPRITE SUPERMARKETS, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TOP RX, INC., WAKEFERN FOOD CORPORATION, WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALGREEN COMPANY, WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (km, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.] | |
Monday, October 21, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-115) transferring case to the USDC for the Northern District of Ohio. (dm ) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.] | |
Friday, November 01, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Jersey. Case number 3:19-cv-18442. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |