California Southern District Court
Judge:M James Lorenz
Referred: Jill L Burkhardt
Case #: 3:19-cv-02104
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441nr Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2019
Case in other court:San Diego Superior Court- County of San Diego, 37-02019-00051411-CU-BT-CTL
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 29, 2020 1:27 AM PDT
Defendant
Conde Nast Entertainment LLC.
Represented By
Peter Zlomke Stockburger
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Robert Anthony Cocchia
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does 1-50
Represented By
Peter Zlomke Stockburger
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Fite
Represented By
James T. Hannink
Dostart Hannink & Coveney LLP
contact info
Zachariah Paul Dostart
Dostart Hannink Coveney LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Saul Granillo
Represented By
James T. Hannink
Dostart Hannink & Coveney LLP
contact info
Zachariah Paul Dostart
Dostart Hannink Coveney LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, January 15, 2021
16 16 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 01/15 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jennifer Fite, Saul Granillo (Dostart, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Status Report Fri 01/15 3:11 PM
STATUS REPORT by Jennifer Fite, Saul Granillo. (Dostart, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
14 14 misc Status Report Tue 11/03 9:15 AM
STATUS REPORT by Jennifer Fite, Saul Granillo. (Dostart, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2020
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/02 5:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Ryan Graf on behalf of Conde Nast Entertainment LLC. (Graf, Kelly)Attorney Kelly Ryan Graf added to party Conde Nast Entertainment LLC.(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/02 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Duvall on behalf of Conde Nast Entertainment LLC. (Duvall, Michael)Attorney Michael J Duvall added to party Conde Nast Entertainment LLC.(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 02/26 9:44 AM
ORDER granting10 Joint Motion regarding settlement and to stay proceedings. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/26/2020. (jpp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
10 10 motion Stay Tue 02/25 12:23 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Notice of Settlement by Jennifer Fite, Saul Granillo.(Dostart, Zachariah) (jpp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Wednesday, December 04, 2019
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 12/04 11:40 AM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint [Doc.8 ]. Cond Nast shall move, plead, or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' Complaint no later than 2/25/2020. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 12/4/2019. (lrf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2019
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Tue 12/03 2:16 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response to the Complaint by Jennifer Fite, Saul Granillo.(Dostart, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Zach P. Dostart,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Thursday, November 07, 2019
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 11/07 8:53 AM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint [Doc.6 ]. Defendant's response to the Complaint must be filed on or before 12/9/2019. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/7/2019. (lrf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2019
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Wed 11/06 3:06 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response to the Complaint by Jennifer Fite, Saul Granillo.(Dostart, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Monday, November 04, 2019
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/04 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Anthony Cocchia on behalf of Conde Nast Entertainment LLC. (Cocchia, Robert)Attorney Robert Anthony Cocchia added to party Conde Nast Entertainment LLC.(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2019
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/01 4:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James T. Hannink on behalf of Jennifer Fite, Saul Granillo (Hannink, James)Attorney James T. Hannink added to party Jennifer Fite(pty:pla), Attorney James T. Hannink added to party Saul Granillo(pty:pla)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Order Reassigning Case Fri 11/01 3:59 PM
MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge M. James Lorenz for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv2104 L-JLB.(no document attached) (mme)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Fri 11/01 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Conde Nast Entertainment LLC.. Identifying Corporate Parent Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., dba Donde Nast for Conde Nast Entertainment LLC.. (jxv)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 11/01 3:15 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego County- San Diego Superior Court, case number 37-02019 00051411-CU-BT-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13122051.), filed by Conde Nast Entertainment LLC.. The new case number is 3:19-cv-02104-BEN-JLB. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(jxv) (sjt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Declaration of Peter Z. Stockburger,
Att: 3 Declaration of Matthew Hoffmeyer,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service