New York Southern District Court
Judge:Gregory H Woods
Case #: 1:19-cv-10256
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2e Job Discrimination (Unlawful Employment Practices)
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2019
Terminated:Jan 30, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 02, 2020 4:41 AM EDT
Defendant
John Bick
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP 450 Lexington Ave,
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Jeh Charles Johnson
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Susanna Michele Buergel
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Marissa C.M. Doran
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Bruce Birenboim
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Harold Birnbaum
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP 450 Lexington Ave
NEW YORK, NY 10017
Represented By
Jeh Charles Johnson
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Susanna Michele Buergel
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Marissa C.M. Doran
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Bruce Birenboim
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Daniel Brass
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP 450 Lexington Ave
NEW YORK, NY 10017
Represented By
Jeh Charles Johnson
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Susanna Michele Buergel
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Marissa C.M. Doran
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Bruce Birenboim
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Defendant
William Chudd
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP 450 Lexington Ave
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Jeh Charles Johnson
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Susanna Michele Buergel
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Marissa C.M. Doran
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Bruce Birenboim
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Davis Polk and Wardwell LLP
450 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Jeh Charles Johnson
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Susanna Michele Buergel
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Marissa C.M. Doran
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Bruce Birenboim
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Sophia Hudson
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP 450 Lexington Ave
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Jeh Charles Johnson
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Susanna Michele Buergel
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Marissa C.M. Doran
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Bruce Birenboim
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Thomas Reid
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP 450 Lexington Ave,
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Jeh Charles Johnson
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Susanna Michele Buergel
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Marissa C.M. Doran
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Bruce Birenboim
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Brian Wolfe
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP 450 Lexington Ave
NEW YORK, NY 10017
Represented By
Jeh Charles Johnson
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Susanna Michele Buergel
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Marissa C.M. Doran
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Bruce Birenboim
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Defendant
John Butler
Represented By
Bruce Birenboim
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Plaintiff
Kaloma Cardwell
Represented By
Martin E. Restituyo
Law Offices Of Martin E. Restituyo, P.C.
contact info
David Jeffries
David Jeffries Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
420 420 appeal USCA Mandate Tue 10/22 4:33 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to419 Notice of Appeal filed by Kaloma Cardwell USCA Case Number 24-606. The parties in the above-referenced case have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to FRAP 42.The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered". Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 10/22/2024.(km)
Related: [-]
appeal Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge Tue 10/22 4:33 PM
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re:420 USCA Mandate.(km)
Related: [-]