Original Case: 1:18-cv-06468

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:19-cv-03180
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2019
Terminated:Mar 25, 2021
Last checked: Friday Mar 26, 2021 6:27 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
CITY OF CHICAGO
Represented By
Matthew Patrick Kellam
LANER MUCHIN, LTD.
contact info
Jennifer A. Naber
LANER MUCHIN, LTD.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ARMANDO CHAGOYA
Represented By
Paul Durbin Geiger
LAW OFFICES OF PAUL D. GEIGER
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
NICHOLAS CHRABOT
Represented By
Paul Durbin Geiger
LAW OFFICES OF PAUL D. GEIGER
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
SHANE COLEMAN
Represented By
Paul Durbin Geiger
LAW OFFICES OF PAUL D. GEIGER
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHRISTOPHER DECANTO
Represented By
Paul Durbin Geiger
LAW OFFICES OF PAUL D. GEIGER
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOSHUA CHAMPION
Represented By
Paul Durbin Geiger
LAW OFFICES OF PAUL D. GEIGER
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
SHANE COLEMAN WEENS
Represented By
Paul Durbin Geiger
LAW OFFICES OF PAUL D. GEIGER
contact info

GPO Mar 25 2021
Filed opinion of the court by Judge Ripple. AFFIRMED. Kenneth F. Ripple, Circuit Judge; Diane P. Wood, Circuit Judge and Michael B. Brennan, Circuit Judge. [7149857-1] [7149857] [19-3180, 19-3183]

Docket last updated: 03/26/2021 6:26 AM CDT
Thursday, October 31, 2019
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Appellant's brief due on or before 12/10/2019 for Armando Chagoya, Joshua Champion, Nicholas Chrabot, Shane Coleman and Christopher DeCanto. Transcript information sheet due by 11/14/2019. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Armando Chagoya, Joshua Champion, Nicholas Chrabot, Shane Coleman and Christopher DeCanto by 11/06/2019. [1] [7040907] 19-3180 (VG) [Entered: 11/01/2019 09:10 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 16 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 3 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court
2 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLANTS: Kyle Gleeson, Jorge Heredia, Eric James, Peter Jonas, Evan Kilponen, Adam Maseth, Ryan McCallum, Scott Minneci, Peter Moore, John Murphy, Ryan Nutile, Pachara Santisuk, Justin Raether, Phillip Renault, Salvatore Ruggiero, Kevin Sheahan and Marco Zenere. [2] [7040919] 19-3180 (VG) [Entered: 11/01/2019 09:23 AM]
Related: [-]