Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-04382
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2019
Last checked: Sunday May 03, 2020 4:16 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
MICHAEL TAYLOR
Represented By
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 04, 2020
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 03/04 5:10 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT -SHORT FORM- against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by MICHAEL TAYLOR. (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/05 3:31 PM
COMPLAINT -SHORT FORM- against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by MICHAEL TAYLOR. (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]