Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:19-bk-60500

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael E Ridgway
Case #: 6:19-ap-06031
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2019
Terminated:May 27, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Tanner Lee Nunn
PO Box 106
Goodridge, MN 56725
Plaintiff
Border State Bank
1528 US Hwy. 59 S
Thief River Falls, MN 56701
Represented By
Brad A. Sinclair
Kaler Doeling, Pllp
contact info
John M. Krings, Jr.
Kaler Doeling, Pllp
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, May 28, 2020
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 05/28 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 05/28/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 05/28 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 05/28/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2020
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Wed 05/27 9:08 AM
Disposition of adversary 6:19-ap-6031. Judgment For Plaintiff. Disposition: Granted. (AnitaM MNBD)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Wed 05/27 9:10 AM
Adversary case 6:19-ap-6031 closed (AnitaM MNBD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
14 14 order MNB Judgment Tue 05/26 3:19 PM
Judgment for adv 6:19-ap-6031. (AnitaM MNBD)
Related: [-]
13 13 order MNB Approve compromise under Ruler 9019 - motion Tue 05/26 3:08 PM
Order Granting Motion to approve compromise under Rule 9019 and Order for Judgment Related [+] (Ridgway,J:5/26/20) (AnitaM MNBD)
Related: [-] 12
court MNB CHAP Minutes re hrg set by motion, aplc or order Tue 05/26 3:05 PM
Minutes re: Related [+] MOTION GRANTED BY DEFAULT. (amm)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to approve compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Border State Bank
Friday, April 24, 2020
12 12 motion MNB Motion to approve compromise under Rule 9019 Fri 04/24 3:09 PM
Motion to approve compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Border State Bank. An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proof of service, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 5/26/2020 at 01:15 PM at Courtroom 2, 2nd Floor, 118 Mill St, Fergus Falls, Judge Michael E. Ridgway. (Sinclair, Brad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 15, 2020
11 11 motion MNB Motion to approve compromise under Rule 9019 Wed 04/15 10:40 AM
Motion to approve compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Border State Bank . An affidavit or verification, Proof of service, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 4/28/2020 at 01:15 PM at Courtroom 2, 2nd Floor, 118 Mill St, Fergus Falls, Judge Michael E. Ridgway. (AnitaM MNBD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
10 10 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Tue 03/03 3:49 PM
Stipulation filed by Border State Bank and Tanner Nunn. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: consent to entry of non dischargeable judgment(Sinclair, Brad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2019
9 9 misc MNB Affidavit (Individual, not service) Tue 12/24 11:09 AM
Affidavit Related [+] filed by Border State Bank. Proof of service.(Sinclair, Brad)
Related: [-] 6 Certificate of service,8 Certificate of service
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
8 8 misc MNB Certificate of service Tue 12/17 4:27 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by Border State Bank.(Sinclair, Brad)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,7 Summons for adversary proceeding
Tuesday, November 19, 2019
7 7 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Tue 11/19 3:34 PM
Summons issued on Tanner Lee Nunn Date Issued 11/19/2019, Answer Due 12/19/2019 (AnitaM MNBD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2019
6 6 misc MNB Certificate of service Tue 11/12 9:40 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by Border State Bank.(Sinclair, Brad)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,3 Summons for adversary proceeding,4 Pro bono notice to defendants
Friday, November 08, 2019
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 11/08 11:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 11/08/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2019
4 4 court MNB Pro bono notice to defendants Wed 11/06 11:38 AM
Pro bono notice to defendants re:1 Complaint. (AnitaM MNBD)
Related: [-]
3 3 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Wed 11/06 11:37 AM
Summons issued on Tanner Lee Nunn Date Issued 11/6/2019, Answer Due 12/6/2019 (AnitaM MNBD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2019
2 2 misc MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice Tue 11/05 5:10 PM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by Border State Bank and John M. Krings Jr... (Krings, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Tue 11/05 4:30 PM
Adversary case 19-06031 (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))), (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)), (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by Border State Bank against Tanner Lee Nunn. Fee Amount $350 (Sinclair, Brad)
Related: [-]