Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-04409
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2019
Last checked: Monday May 04, 2020 4:53 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Defendant
AERO HOLDING LLC
Plaintiff
ROBERT LONG
Represented By
RICHARD M PAUL, III
Paul Llp - Kansas City Mo
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
3 3 17 pgs order Order Thu 01/23 10:21 AM
AMENDED ORDER - For the foregoing reasons, the Court finds that Defendants have satisfied the requirements for removal under § 1442(a)(1) and that it has subject matter jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' claims. Accordingly: (1.) Plaintiffs motions to remand are DENIED. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this amended order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual dockets for Minnesota cases in which motions to remand were pending on January 13, 2020. (2.) The Clerk is further directed to sever the Minnesota multi-plaintiff actions as follows: all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short complaint in the approved form for the MDL at ECF NO. 705. The filing fee will be waived for any Minnesota plaintiff who is severed pursuant to this order and who timely files a short form complaint within 30 days of the dismissal without prejudice. The provisions of Pretrial Order No. 16, ECF No. 761, govern the severance process. (3.) All other deadlines applicable to 3M MDL plaintiffs--including census obligations--are now reinstated as to the Minnesota plaintiffs. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/22/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2019
2 2 motion Remand Thu 12/05 2:06 PM
MOTION to Remand by ROBERT LONG. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 12/05 2:17 PM
Set Deadlines - (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 12/19/2019) . (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/06 2:01 PM
COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants, filed by ROBERT LONG. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]