Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steven D Grimberg
Case #: 1:19-cv-05011
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2019
Terminated:Nov 13, 2020

Debtor
HRN Group, LLC

,
Last checked: Sunday May 03, 2020 6:14 AM EDT
Appellant
HRN Group, LLC
4596 Meadow Creek Path
Lithonia, GA 30003
Appellee
Wilmington Savings Fund

GPO Jul 21 2020
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Within 30 days after entry of this Order, HRN is ORDERED to file a notice of appearance of counsel on its behalf. Failure to comply with this directive will result in dismissal of this action with prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this Order to the Court in 30 days. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 7/21/2020. (rjs)
GPO Nov 13 2020
OPINION and ORDER AFFIRMING the bankruptcy court's October 23, 2019 order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to DISMISS this appeal and close the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/13/2020. (bdb) Modified on 11/16/2020 to edit text (jed).

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, November 13, 2020
25 25 misc Judgment - Clerk Fri 11/13 4:41 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT ENTERED that the order of the bankruptcy court is affirmed and the appeal is dismissed. (bdb)
Related: [-]
24 24 23 pgs order Order on Decision of Bankruptcy Fri 11/13 4:17 PM
OPINION and ORDER AFFIRMING that bankruptcy court's October 23, 2019 order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to DISMISS this appeal and close the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/13/2020. (bdb)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 11/13 4:42 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (bdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 10, 2020
23 23 respm Reply Brief Tue 11/10 12:41 AM
REPLY BRIEF re20 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Staying Foreclosure Sale MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Oral Argument filed by HRN Group, LLC. (Ward, Graylin)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 11/10 9:01 AM
Submission of16 Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Schedule to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jed)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2020
22 22 appeal Appellees Brief Mon 10/26 6:41 PM
Appellee's BRIEF by Wilmington Savings Fund. (Jordan, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
21 21 minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion for TRO Order on Motion for Oral Argument Wed 10/07 2:19 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steven D. Grimberg: Denying20 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for TRO. Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 10/6/2020 re20 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Staying Foreclosure Sale MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by HRN Group, LLC. For the reasons stated on the record, the motion is DENIED. First, Appellant has not shown a likelihood of success on the merits of the appeals pending before this Court. Second, to the extent Appellant has shown the possibility of any harm, it has not established that the real property at issue is so unique that Appellant cannot be monetarily compensated for any harm it does suffer through the foreclosure sale of such property. Finally, the balance of the equities and public interest weigh in favor of permitting the foreclosure sale to go forward. No connection between the proceedings in the now-dismissed bankruptcy action in the Eastern District of New York and Appellant's motion or the appeals pending before this Court has been shown. However, this ruling is without prejudice for Appellant to seek a stay of the rulings from the Bankruptcy Court in the Northern District of Georgia that are the subject of the appeals under consideration by this Court. (Court Reporter Alicia Bagley)(bdb)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 10/06 8:16 AM
Submission of20 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Staying Foreclosure Sale and Temporary Restraining Order and Oral Argument, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (bdb) Modified on 10/6/2020 to add text (bdb)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Video/Telephone Proceeding Tue 10/06 1:02 PM
NOTICE OF TELEPHONE PROCEEDING re:20 Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Staying Foreclosure Sale MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Oral Argument. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2020 at 03:00 PM in No Courtroom before Judge Steven D. Grimberg. Connection Instructions: Dial in Number: 646-828-7666; Meeting ID: 161 660 5845; Passcode: 670249. You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available[LINK:here] . The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available[LINK:here] . Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (ash)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2020
20 20 motion Preliminary Injunction Mon 10/05 4:41 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Staying Foreclosure Sale with Brief In Support by HRN Group, LLC.(Ward, Graylin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Sale, Lift of Automatic Stay
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/29 12:06 PM
EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (mmc) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 25, 2020
18 18 appeal Appellants Brief Fri 09/25 12:03 AM
Appellant's BRIEF by HRN Group, LLC. (Ward, Graylin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Wed 09/02 12:47 PM
SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (mmc) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 25, 2020
16 16 appeal Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Schedule Tue 08/25 3:28 PM
Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Schedule to all parties. Appellants Brief due by 9/24/2020. Appellees Brief due by 10/26/2020. Appellants Reply Brief due by 11/9/2020. Submission ddl: 11/10/2020. (bdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 24, 2020
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 08/24 2:30 PM
Submission of12 Order, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (bdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2020
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/24 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance, Request for Service of Papers by Graylin C. Ward on behalf of HRN Group, LLC. (Originally filed in 1:20-cv-704 docket 23) (bdb)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/24 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance, Request for Service of Papers by Graylin C. Ward on behalf of HRN Group, LLC. (Originally filed in 1:20-cv-704-SDG. docket 22) (bdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 04, 2020
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Tue 08/04 8:21 AM
SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 08/04 3:49 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to HRN Group, LLC re13 Notice (Other). (tcc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 21, 2020
12 12 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Tue 07/21 12:25 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Within 30 days after entry of this Order, HRN is ORDERED to file a notice of appearance of counsel on its behalf. Failure to comply with this directive will result in dismissal of this action with prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this Order to the Court in 30 days. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 7/21/2020. (rjs)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 07/21 12:26 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to HRN Group, LLC re12 Order. (rjs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 14, 2020
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 07/14 4:24 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to HRN Group, LLC re11 Notice (Other). (jed)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2020
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/13 8:59 AM
FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (aaq) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2020
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Thu 07/02 12:33 PM
FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 07/02 4:26 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to HRN Group, LLC re10 Notice (Other). (jed)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2020
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/27 12:48 PM
THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/27 5:02 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to HRN Group, LLC re9 Notice (Other). (jed)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 05, 2020
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/05 9:29 AM
SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (rvb) (ADI)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 05/05 4:18 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to HRN Group, LLC re8 Notice (Other). (jed)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 04, 2020
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/04 11:51 AM
Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (jpa) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 03, 2020
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/03 10:51 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to HRN Group, LLC re6 Notice (Other). (jed)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 02, 2020
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/02 12:00 PM
Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (aaq) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 23, 2020
5 5 4 pgs order Order Mon 03/23 1:38 PM
General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (jed)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 03/23 1:39 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to HRN Group, LLC re5 Order. (jed)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2019
4 4 notice Certificate of Compliance Wed 12/11 3:04 PM
CERTIFICATE of Compliance by HRN Group, LLC. (jed)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2019
3 3 appeal Bankruptcy Record Received Wed 12/04 10:24 AM
BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED - Designated items not filed(Lugo, Yahaira)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Issues doc111
Thursday, November 21, 2019
2 2 30+ pgs order Order Thu 11/21 9:12 AM
STANDING ORDER All counsel of record and pro se parties are required to sign and file, within 10 days after entry of this Order, a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/2/19. (jpa)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2019
misc Fee Payment Received Tue 11/19 9:00 AM
Filing Fee Paid: $ 298, receipt number 1259582 (adg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2019
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 11/06 12:02 PM
Submission of1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg for IFP review. (ah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2019
1 1 appeal Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal Wed 11/06 12:01 PM
Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal filed by HRN Group, LLC, USBC Case#: 18-63282 wlh. Notice of Appeal filed 11/04/2019 from Order entered 10/23/2019 by Appellant HRN Group, LLC. Fee Paid: NO.(ah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 NOA doc100,
Att: 2 Order doc92,
Att: 3 Docket Sheet