City of Columbia South Carolina v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45979 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 07, 2019 |
Case in other court: | South Carolina, 3:19-cv-02893 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 4:28 PM EST |
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Columbia South Carolina, City of
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/08/2019 3:14 PM EST |
Friday, October 11, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 160 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8719623.), filed by Columbia South Carolina, City of. Service due by 1/9/2020(asni, ) [Transferred from scd on 11/7/2019.] | |
Att: 1 list of related MDL cases | ||
2 | 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Columbia South Carolina, City of.(asni, ) [Transferred from scd on 11/7/2019.] | |
3 | 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Columbia South Carolina, City of.(asni, ) [Transferred from scd on 11/7/2019.] | |
Thursday, October 31, 2019 | ||
6 | 6 Case transferred to Northern Ohio per certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order Number 117. The Transferring Clerk's Office hereby attests the record and the docket sheet available through CM/ECF to be the certified list. (asni, ) [Transferred from scd on 11/7/2019.] | |
Thursday, November 07, 2019 | ||
7 | 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of South Carolina. Case number 3:19-cv-02893. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |