New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Pamela K Chen
Referred: Magistrate Jud Roanne L Mann
Case #: 2:19-cv-06186
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2019
Terminated:Feb 18, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 29, 2020 5:14 AM EDT
Defendant
State University of New York
Represented By
Helena Ann Lynch
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Eva Lenore Dietz
Office Of Nys Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Suny College of Technology Farmingdale State College
Represented By
Helena Ann Lynch
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Eva Lenore Dietz
Office Of Nys Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Dr. Amit Bandyopadhyay, PE, FASCE
Represented By
Stewart Lee Karlin
The Law Offices Of Stewart Lee Karlin, P.C.
contact info
Natalia Mercedes Kapitonova
The Law Offices Of Stewart Lee Karlin PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
The State of New York
Terminated: 02/26/2020
Represented By
Helena Ann Lynch
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Eva Lenore Dietz
Office Of Nys Attorney General
contact info

GPO Mar 30 2021
ORDER: For the reasons discussed in the attached Memorandum and Order, Defendants' 18, 21 motion to dismiss is denied. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 3/30/2021. (Li, Caroline)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, February 18, 2022
order Order Dismissing Case Fri 02/18 8:26 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The37 Stipulation of Settlement, General Release, and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice is SO ORDERED. This case is dismissed and closed. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 2/18/2022. (Stephan, Keegan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 17, 2022
37 37 13 pgs misc Settlement Agreement Thu 02/17 4:59 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT For the Court's approval and to be so-ordered by State University of New York, Suny College of Technology Farmingdale State College (Lynch, Helena)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 24, 2022
adr Report of Mediation(Settled/Unsettled) Mon 01/24 9:46 AM
REPORT of Mediation Settled Both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be submitted within two weeks following mediation session. Mediation Report due by 2/7/2022. (Priftakis, Tina)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
36 36 motion Stay Fri 01/21 3:02 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Litigation due to Settlement in Principle by State University of New York. (Dietz, Eva)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Stay ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 01/21 5:25 PM
ORDER granting36 Motion to Stay. The parties' joint application is granted; the stipulation of discontinuance is due by February 21, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 1/21/2022. (Ertzbischoff, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
adr Selection of Mediator Tue 11/16 3:48 PM
SELECTION OF MEDIATOR: James G. Ryan selected as Pro Bono Mediator. The first mediation session will take place on TBD. Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation in person. Attendance in person is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov or fax (718) 613-2333. Contact information for the Mediator is on the docket sheet. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. Report of Mediation due by TBD. (Priftakis, Tina)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 12, 2021
35 35 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 11/12 11:38 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by State University of New York. (Lynch, Helena)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 11/12 4:15 PM
ORDER granting35 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The parties' joint request to extend fact discovery until February 28, 2022 is granted. Given the length of the extension, and the age of the case, no further extension will be granted absent a showing of exceptional circumstances. The parties are directed to select a mediator by November 15, 2021 ; the deadline for filing a joint post-mediation status report is extended to January 21, 2022 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 11/12/2021. (LK)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 17, 2021
34 34 motion Request Mediation Fri 09/17 11:31 AM
Consent Motion to Request Mediation request waiver of SUNY's portion of fee, or, alternatively, conference before the Court by State University of New York, Suny College of Technology Farmingdale State College. (Lynch, Helena)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Request Mediation Fri 09/17 3:18 PM
ORDER granting in part34 Motion to Request Mediation. Defendant SUNY has requested, with plaintiff's consent, that this Court either conduct a settlement conference or waive SUNY's portion of the mediation fee, "which would otherwise have to be paid from taxpayer funds." DE #34 at 2. Given the very modest cost of court-annexed mediation, and the potential enormous savings of taxpayer dollars in the event a settlement is reached, this Court has been reluctant to waive the mediation fee in cases involving governmental defendants, who clearly can afford the $300 expense. Nevertheless, given the circumstances of this particular case, the Court will make an exception and will waive the fee for all parties. The ADR Administrator is respectfully requested to attempt to locate a mediator willing to handle this matter on a pro bono basis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 9/17/2021. (LK)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 10, 2021
order Order Referring Case to Mediation Fri 09/10 1:20 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Re [DE #33]:Selection of Mediator due by 9/24/2021. The parties' belief that settlement discussions would not prove productive is not a sufficient basis for dispensing with the Court's requirement that parties in all civil cases participate in good faith in settlement discussions, either before the Court or a neutral mediator from the EDNY Mediation Panel; the Court is aware of many cases that have settled through those processes despite the parties' skepticism about their potential effectiveness. Therefore, the case is referred for court-annexed mediation, with the session(s) to be held in November of this year. A joint post-mediation status report is due by December 2, 2021 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 9/10/2021. (LK)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Instructions Fri 09/10 5:05 PM
MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants, including the mediator, and sent via email to Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. (Priftakis, Tina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
33 33 misc Status Report Thu 09/09 3:54 PM
STATUS REPORT on behalf of all parties by State University of New York, Suny College of Technology Farmingdale State College (Lynch, Helena)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 08/31 10:16 AM
ORDER31 Motion for Protective Order. The Court so-orders the parties' Confidentiality Stipulation, with the following clarifications: Paragraph 15(a): Protected Material that is filed under seal must be filed electronically under seal, in accordance with the Individual Rules of the judicial officer to whom the submission is directed. Paragraph 16 does not apply to the Court's copies of Protected Material. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/31/2021. (LK)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 08/31 10:30 AM
ORDER32 is so-ordered. Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/31/2021. (LK)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 30, 2021
32 32 motion Protective Order Mon 08/30 4:13 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Rule 502(d) Order) by State University of New York, Suny College of Technology Farmingdale State College. (Lynch, Helena)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Protective Order Mon 08/30 4:12 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Stipulation and Order of Protection for Confidential Information) by State University of New York, Suny College of Technology Farmingdale State College. (Lynch, Helena)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 21, 2021
order Order(Other) Mon 06/21 11:11 AM
ORDER [DE #30]: As the parties report that a settlement conference (or mediation) would not be productive "at this time," they are directed to confer further and, by September 10, 2021 , file a joint letter (docketed as an ECF motion event) requesting either a settlement conference or referral to court-annexed mediation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 6/21/2021. (LK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 17, 2021
30 30 misc Status Report Thu 06/17 6:54 PM
STATUS REPORT by State University of New York (Lynch, Helena)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
29 29 minutes Initial Conference Hearing Tue 05/18 1:47 PM
Minute Entry for Initial Conference Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 5/18/2021. Fact discovery must be completed by December 1, 2021. The Court defers setting a schedule for expert discovery and requests for a premotion conference. By June 18, 2021, the parties must file a joint letter-motion requesting that the discovery schedule be held in abeyance (in the event the parties have agreed to settle the case) or requesting a settlement conference or a referral to court-annexed mediation. See attached . (Proujansky, Josh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
28 28 misc Case Management Statement Wed 05/12 11:29 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Jointly by the parties) (Karlin, Stewart)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 03, 2021
27 27 order Scheduling Order Mon 05/03 10:29 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held on May 18, 2021 @ 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED: ORDER, INITIAL CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE, AND MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE. Counsel are directed to confer to jointly fill out and docket the attached questionnaire by 3:00 p.m. on May 14, 2021. *** To dial in to the initial conference, the parties are directed to call (877) 336-1839 and type in the access code 6672833. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 5/3/2021. (GM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 30, 2021
26 26 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 04/30 2:44 PM
ANSWER to16 Amended Complaint by State University of New York, Suny College of Technology Farmingdale State College. (Lynch, Helena)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 06, 2021
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 04/06 2:05 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by State University of New York, Suny College of Technology Farmingdale State College, The State of New York. (Dietz, Eva)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/06 4:40 PM
ORDER granting, on consent25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 4/6/2021. (LK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
24 24 12 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 03/30 10:44 PM
ORDER: For the reasons discussed in the attached Memorandum and Order, Defendants'18 ,21 motion to dismiss is denied. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 3/30/2021. (Li, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2020
23 23 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 07/24 2:24 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Supplemental letter brief pursuant to Court's June 2, 2020 Text Order filed by State University of New York, Suny College of Technology Farmingdale State College. (Lynch, Helena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 15, 2020
22 22 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 07/15 3:14 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Supplemental letter brief pursuant to Court's June 2, 2020 Text Order filed by Amit Bandyopadhyay, PE, FASCE. (Karlin, Stewart)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 26, 2020
21 21 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 06/26 2:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Supplemental letter brief pursuant to Court's June 2, 2020 Text Order by State University of New York, Suny College of Technology Farmingdale State College. (Lynch, Helena)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 06/09 2:00 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File supplemental letter in further support of motion to dismiss by State University of New York, Suny College of Technology Farmingdale State College, The State of New York. (Dietz, Eva)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 06/09 2:09 PM
ORDER: Defendants'20 motion for an extension of time to file, on consent of Plaintiff, is granted. Defendants may file their supplemental letter by June 26, 2020; Plaintiff may file his response by July 15, 2020; and Defendants may file a reply by July 24, 2020. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 6/9/2020. (Wisotsky, Shira)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Tue 06/02 6:58 PM
ORDER: Defendants'18 motion for a pre-motion conference is denied as unnecessary. The Court construes18 Defendants' letter as a motion to dismiss and will permit additional briefing as follows: Defendants may file a supplemental letter, limited to five pages, by June 16, 2020; Plaintiff may file a supplemental response letter, limited to five pages, by June 30, 2020; and Defendants may file a letter reply, limited to three pages, by July 7, 2020. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 6/2/2020. (Wisotsky, Shira)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/29 11:05 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re18 MOTION for pre motion conference in anticipation of motion to dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Amit Bandyopadhyay, PE, FASCE. (Kapitonova, Natalia)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 22, 2020
18 18 motion Pre Motion Conference Fri 05/22 10:16 AM
MOTION for pre motion conference in anticipation of motion to dismiss Amended Complaint by State University of New York, Suny College of Technology Farmingdale State College, The State of New York. (Lynch, Helena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 01, 2020
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 04/01 10:08 AM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint by State University of New York, Suny College of Technology Farmingdale State College, The State of New York. (Dietz, Eva)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/01 1:03 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER re17 : Application granted, on consent. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 4/1/2020. (Vallens, Adrian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 02/25 1:05 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against State University of New York, Suny College of Technology Farmingdale State College, filed by Amit Bandyopadhyay, PE, FASCE. (Karlin, Stewart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Right to Sue Letter
Tuesday, February 18, 2020
15 15 motion Extension of Time to Amend Tue 02/18 1:39 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend by Amit Bandyopadhyay, PE, FASCE. (Karlin, Stewart)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Tue 02/18 3:01 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's15 motion for an extension of time to amend, on consent of Defendant, is granted. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint by February 25, 2020; Defendant must file its response by April 10, 2020. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 2/18/2020. (Wisotsky, Shira)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2020
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/12 12:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Helena Ann Lynch on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Lynch, Helena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2020
13 13 misc Letter Wed 01/29 4:04 PM
Letter response to defendant's letter dated January 23, 2020 by Amit Bandyopadhyay, PE, FASCE (Kapitonova, Natalia)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/29 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Natalia Mercedes Kapitonova on behalf of Amit Bandyopadhyay, PE, FASCE (aty to be noticed) (Kapitonova, Natalia)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Wed 01/29 5:25 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's13 request to file an amended complaint by February 18, 2020 is granted. Defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint is extended to April 3, 2020 . In light of Plaintiff's anticipated amended complaint, and Defendants' consent to the amended schedule, Defendants'11 request for a premotion conference regarding an anticipated motion to dismiss is denied as moot. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 1/29/2020. (Wisotsky, Shira)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2020
11 11 motion Pre Motion Conference Thu 01/23 1:55 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference regarding Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss by State University of New York, Suny College of Technology Farmingdale State College, The State of New York. (Dietz, Eva)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2019
order Order on Motion to Reassign Case Tue 12/24 10:04 AM
ORDER: Defendants'10 motion to reassign the case to Long Island is denied. The Guidelines for the Division of Business Among District Judges, adopted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 137, explicitly state that "[t]hese rules are adopted for the internal management of the caseload of the court and shall not be deemed to vest any rights in litigants or their attorneys..." Rule 50.3.1(f) of the Guidelines, entitled "No Vested Rights," reiterates the same. The Court grants Defendants' request for thirty days from the date of this order, i.e. , January 23, 2020 , to file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 12/24/2019. (Wisotsky, Shira)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2019
10 10 motion Reassign Case Fri 12/20 5:04 PM
Letter MOTION to Reassign Case to Long Island by State University of New York, Suny College of Technology Farmingdale State College, The State of New York. (Dietz, Eva)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2019
9 9 service Summons Issued Thu 11/07 3:06 PM
Summons Issued as to State University of New York, Suny College of Technology Farmingdale State College, The State of New York. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Thu 11/07 3:03 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 11/07 3:00 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for additional corrections that were made. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 11/07 1:46 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 11/07 3:02 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2019
5 5 Civil Cover Sheet.. by AMIT BANDYOPADHYAY (Karlin, Stewart)
Related: [-]
Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2019
4 4 Proposed Summons. by AMIT BANDYOPADHYAY (Karlin, Stewart)
Related: [-]
3 3 Proposed Summons. by AMIT BANDYOPADHYAY (Karlin, Stewart)
Related: [-]
2 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by AMIT BANDYOPADHYAY (Karlin, Stewart)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against SUNY COLLEGE OF TECHNOLOGY FARMINGDALE STATE COLLEGE, State University of New York, The State of New York filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12002915 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by AMIT BANDYOPADHYAY. (Karlin, Stewart)
Related: [-]