California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:19-mj-04920
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2019
Last checked: Thursday Nov 07, 2019 11:23 PM PST
Defendant
Moises Quezada-Preciado (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Material Witness
Ying Lin
Represented By
Christopher K. Monelt
Law Offices Of Christopher K. Monelt
contact info
Material Witness
Xiu Hua Qiu
Represented By
Christopher K. Monelt
Law Offices Of Christopher K. Monelt
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Steven Lee
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/08/2019 12:59 AM PST
Wednesday, November 06, 2019
Arrest of Moises Quezada-Preciado (no document attached) (acc)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Moises Quezada-Preciado.(acc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Minute Order. Material Witness Attorney Christopher K. Monelt appointed for Ying Lin and Xiu Hua Qiu. Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Moises Quezada-Preciado: Initial Appearance set for 11/6/2019 before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. (no document attached) (lrc)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Initial Appearance as to Moises Quezada-Preciado held on 11/6/2019. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Moises Quezada-Preciado. Bond set as to Moises Quezada-Preciado (1) $15,000 PS secured by 1 FRA and $1500 cash deposit. Preliminary Hearing set for 11/19/19 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Arraignment set for 12/05/19 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. (Interpreter Dan DeCoursey). (CD# 11/6/2019 AHG 19-1:3:39-4:01). (Plaintiff Attorney Deborah Bercovitch AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Aron Israelite FD-S/A). (aje)
Related: [-]
4 4 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Moises Quezada-Preciado (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Moises Quezada-Preciado (1) $15,000 P/S. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 11/6/19. (jmo)
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Moises Quezada-Preciado. (jmo)
Related: [-]