Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-04492
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday May 06, 2020 5:07 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
JOHN WEST
Represented By
MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Lanier Law Firm - Woodland Hills Ca
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, November 14, 2019
4 4 misc Affidavit Thu 11/14 11:02 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by JOHN WEST. (AKSELRUD, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2019
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 11/13 2:13 PM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2019
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 11/08 1:18 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (AKSELRUD, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/08 1:17 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JOHN WEST. (AKSELRUD, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons (3M),
Att: 2 Summons (Aearo)