California Central District Court
Judge:Dolly M Gee
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:19-cv-09631
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Interpleader Action
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2019
Terminated:Sep 16, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday May 06, 2020 2:09 AM PDT
Defendant
Marci Holliday
Represented By
Moran Stelmach
Law Office Of Ronald Richards And Associates Apc
contact info
Ronald N Richards
Law Offices Of Ronald Richards And Associates Apc
contact info
Defendant
Thomas S. Holliday
Represented By
Christina Prospero Gabar
Oldman Cooley Sallus Birnberg Coleman And Gold LLP
contact info
Marc L Sallus
Oldman Cooley Sallus Birmberg And Coleman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Devon Pothier
Represented By
Christina Prospero Gabar
Oldman Cooley Sallus Birnberg Coleman And Gold LLP
contact info
Marc L Sallus
Oldman Cooley Sallus Birmberg And Coleman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Gabriela Maria Traxler-Romin
Hinshaw And Culbertson LLP
contact info
Chakameh Ganji
Hinshaw And Culbertson LLP
contact info
Misty A Murray
Hinshaw And Culbertson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
44 44 misc Financial Entry Tue 10/20 9:48 AM
FINANCIAL ENTRY: Disbursed $1,556,562.66 from the registry of the Court to OLDMAN, COOLEY, SALLUS, GOLD, BIRNBERG & COLEMAN, L.L.P. CLIENT TRUST ACCOUNT ON 10/19/2020. Re: Order,,,,, Distribution of Funds,,,,42 . (pri)
Related: [-]
43 43 misc Financial Entry Tue 10/20 9:45 AM
FINANCIAL ENTRY: Disbursed $501,948.58 from the registry of the Court to MARCI HOLLIDAY ON 10/19/2020. Re: Order,,,,, Distribution of Funds,,,,42 . (pri)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
42 42 10 pgs order Order Distribution of Funds Wed 10/07 8:57 AM
AMENDED ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION RE SETTLEMENT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Amended Stipulation41 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulation for Settlement as executed by the parties on 9/3/2020, is hereby approved. The Clerk of the Court is authorized to release funds deposited into the Court Registry by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company ("MetLife") in this matter as follows: i. Of the principal amount of $2,052,606.44 deposited by MetLife, $500,000.00 shall be distributed and made payable to Marci Holliday. Of the interest accrued since the deposit, 33% shall be distributed to Marci Holliday. ii. The balance of the principal in the amount of $1,552,606.44, is to be distributed to Devon Holliday (a.k.a. Devon Pothier) and Thomas S. Holliday ("Trey"). The balance of accrued interest shall be distributed to Devon Holliday a.k.a. Devon Pothier and Thomas S. Holliday. The above-captioned action is dismissed and all dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED. (gk)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2020
41 41 stip Settlement Mon 10/05 3:58 PM
Amended STIPULATION for Settlement filed by Defendant Thomas S. Holliday, Devon Pothier.(Sallus, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
40 40 11 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 09/16 2:52 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION RE SETTLEMENT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation39 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is authorized to release funds deposited into the Court Registry in this matter as follows: $500,000.00 shall be distributed and made payable to Marci Holliday. The balance of the proceeds are to be distributed to Devon Holliday a.k.a. Devon Pothier and Thomas S. Holliday. The action is dismissed and all dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED. See document for further details. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (gk)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 11, 2020
39 39 stip Settlement Fri 09/11 11:52 AM
First STIPULATION for Settlement filed by Defendant Thomas S. Holliday, Devon Pothier.(Sallus, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Approving Settlement
Friday, July 10, 2020
38 38 2 pgs order Order Fri 07/10 2:16 PM
ORDER TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND DEADLINES TO FILE RELEVANT MOTIONS by Judge Dolly M. Gee, re Stipulation37 . See document for details. (gk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
37 37 stip Discovery Tue 07/07 5:17 PM
First STIPULATION for Discovery as to Deadlines re Responses Due and Any Relevant Motion Filing Deadlines filed by Defendants-in-Interpleader Thomas S. Holliday, Devon Pothier.(Sallus, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending Deadlines for Discovery and Motion Filing Dates
Thursday, April 30, 2020
36 36 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 05/01 9:13 AM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR: (1) PLAINTIFF-IN-INTERPLEADER METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY'S DISCHARGE AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; AND (2) PERMANENT INJUNCTION35 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: 1. That Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (MetLife) is discharged of any and all liability with respect to the $2,052,606.44 on deposit with the Court, which amount represents supplemental life insurance coverage in the amount of $2,000,000 and cash accumulation fund in the amount of $12,251.16, plus applicable interest (collectively the Policy Benefits), due pursuant to the Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP Group Variable Life Insurance Policy and certificate of life insurance number 0000102423 (collectively the "Policy") issued by MetLife and insuring Thomas E. Holliday (Decedent), as well as any and all claims that Defendants-in-Interpleader Devon Pothier, Marci Holliday, and Thomas S. Holliday have or could have asserted regarding the Policy Benefits and/or the Policy. Each party shall bear his, her, or its own attorneys' fees and costs. See order for details. (lom)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 27, 2020
35 35 stip Discharge Mon 04/27 4:05 PM
STIPULATION for Discharge of -- Stipulation for (1) Plaintiff-In-Interpleader Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Discharge and Dismissal with Prejudice; and (2) Permanent Injunction filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Murray, Misty)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 25, 2020
34 34 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/25 4:50 PM
NOTICE of Disassociation of Counsel filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Murray, Misty)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2020
33 33 misc Financial Entry Fri 02/28 3:51 PM
FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $2,052,606.44 into the registry of the Court from Metropolitan Life Insurance Company on 02/27/2020. Re: Order on Motion to Deposit Funds,,30 . Receipt number LA202941. (pri)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2020
32 32 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Mon 02/24 2:50 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 10/13/2020. Joint status report re settlement due by 10/20/2020. (gk)
Related: [-]
31 31 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Mon 02/24 1:27 PM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Jury Trial set for 3/23/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. See document for further details. (gk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
30 30 order Deposit Funds Wed 02/12 8:23 AM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO COURT REGISTRY BY PLAINTIFF-IN-INTERPLEADER METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Application29 , leave is hereby granted for MetLife, or its authorized agent or representative, to deposit with the Court Clerk a check made payable to the "Clerk of Court, U.S. District Court, Central District of California" in the amount of $2,012,251.16, plus any applicable interest. Such deposit may be made at any time after this Order is signed by the Court. (gk)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2020
29 29 motion Deposit Funds Mon 02/10 4:23 PM
APPLICATION to Deposit Funds Into Court Registry filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Ganji, Chakameh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 06, 2020
28 28 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 02/06 10:53 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court sua sponte VACATES the Scheduling Conference set on February 7, 2020. A Scheduling and Case Management Order to issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2020
27 27 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 01/31 9:48 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Marci Holliday, (Richards, Ronald)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 01/31 8:45 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)25 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2020
25 25 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 01/30 10:47 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 with JURY DEMAND filed by defendant Marci Holliday.(Richards, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2020
24 24 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 01/24 12:44 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 days, filed by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company..(Ganji, Chakameh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "A"
23 23 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Fri 01/24 11:12 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Marci Holliday answer now due 1/28/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by defendant Marci Holliday.(Attorney Ronald N Richards added to party Marci Holliday(pty:dft))(Richards, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2019
22 22 misc Miscellaneous Document Thu 12/26 4:02 PM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties re: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,,18 , Miscellaneous Document21 , Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),17 (Sallus, Marc)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Miscellaneous Document Thu 12/26 11:00 AM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties re: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,,18 , Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),17 (Sallus, Marc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2019
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/23 4:09 PM
NOTICE of Disassociation of Counsel filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Murray, Misty)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 12/23 7:39 AM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/24/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2019
18 18 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 12/19 4:53 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
Related: [-]
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 12/19 11:51 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants-in-Interpleader Thomas S. Holliday, Devon Pothier.(Attorney Marc L Sallus added to party Thomas S. Holliday(pty:dft), Attorney Marc L Sallus added to party Devon Pothier(pty:dft))(Sallus, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
16 16 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 12/17 5:52 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. upon Marci Holliday waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Ronald N. Richards. (Ganji, Chakameh)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 12/17 5:47 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. upon Thomas S. Holliday waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Thomas S. Holliday. (Ganji, Chakameh)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2019
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/16 11:32 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. upon Devon Pothier waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Devon Pothier. (Ganji, Chakameh)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 12/16 11:15 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Chakameh Ganji counsel for Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Adding Chakameh Ganji as counsel of record for Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Metropolitan Life Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attorney Chakameh Ganji added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Ganji, Chakameh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
12 12 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 11/20 2:56 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2019
11 11 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 11/20 7:33 AM
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO JUDGE GEE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Reassign Pursuant to General Order 19-03 filed on 11/18/2019. The case number will now read CV 19-9631 DMG (SKx). Additional information about Judge Gee's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2019
10 10 cs_rasgn Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 19-03 (CV-52) Mon 11/18 4:44 PM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-09631 DMG(SKx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2019
9 9 cs_rasgn Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 19-03 (CV-52) Thu 11/14 5:22 PM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Case transferred from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to the calendar of Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-09631 CAS(SKx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2019
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 11/12 4:48 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Marci Holliday, Thomas S. Holliday, Devon Pothier. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 11/12 4:46 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 11/12 4:46 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2019
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 11/08 2:32 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying MetLife, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Murray, Misty)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 11/08 2:31 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, (Murray, Misty)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Fri 11/08 2:28 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Murray, Misty)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 11/08 2:24 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Murray, Misty)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 11/08 2:21 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24755255 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attorney Misty A Murray added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Murray, Misty)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A through K to Complaint