Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-46769

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jil Mazer-Marino
Case #: 1:19-bk-46771
Case Filed:Nov 09, 2019
Terminated:Feb 12, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $50,001 to $100,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
TAL ON 1ST INC.
357 1st Ave
New York, NY 10010-5611
Represented By
Lawrence Morrison
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn Office) U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Suite 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, February 12, 2021
court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 02/12 8:42 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (fmr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 28, 2021
38 38 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Fri 01/29 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 01/28/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 25, 2021
37 37 order Dismissing Case and Barring Debtor(s) with Notice Tue 01/26 1:40 PM
Order Dismissing Case With Prejudice and Barring Debtor(s) LX Avenue Bagels Inc., Amir Ram Bagels Inc. and Tal on 1st Inc. from filing voluntary petitions for relief under the Bankruptcy Code for one year following the date of entry of this order, absent prior authority from the Court on written notice to the United States Trustee, starting 1/26/2021 to 1/26/2022; the Debtors pay to the United States Trustee the appropriate sum required, if any, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1930, within ten (10) days of the entry of this order and simultaneously provide to the United States Trustee an appropriate affidavit indicating the cash disbursements, if any, for the relevant period; the court may retain jurisdiction to hear matters related to these cases. Signed on 1/25/2021 (fmr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Case Owned BK) Wed 01/13 12:13 PM
Hearing Held and Marked Off / Motion to dismiss case granted - Appearances: Brian Hufnagel Representing Debtor, Jemery Sussman Representing the Office of the United States Trustee - Related [+] (tml)
Related: [-] 7 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned BK) Sun 12/27 10:31 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing - Status hearing to be held on 01/13/2021 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. Related [+] (tmg)
Related: [-] 7 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Monday, December 14, 2020
36 36 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Mon 12/14 11:52 AM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from December 16, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. to January 13, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. Filed by Brian J Hufnagel on behalf of TAL on 1st Inc. Related [+] (Hufnagel, Brian)
Related: [-] 7 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Friday, November 27, 2020
35 35 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Reassignment of Case Sat 11/28 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Reassignment of Case Notice Date 11/27/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 23, 2020
34 34 order Order Reassign Case [Batch] (Judge Craig Cases Only) (Court Use ONLY) Wed 11/25 11:27 AM
Order to Reassign Case from Judge Louis A. Scarcella to Judge Jil Mazer-Marino . (nds)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned BK) Tue 11/17 12:17 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/16/2020 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Mazer-Marino), Brooklyn, NY. (adobson)
Related: [-] 7 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Wed 10/21 10:57 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance: Brian Hufnagel, Rachel Wolf Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/15/2020 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (dcorsini)
Related: [-] Hearing Sched/Resched(Case Owned)
Monday, September 28, 2020
court Hearing Sched/Resched (Case Owned) Mon 09/28 1:38 PM
Hearing Scheduled, Rescheduled Status hearing to be held on 10/20/2020 at 11:00 AM (Judge Scarcella) Related [+] (dhc)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor TAL on 1st Inc.,7 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Reassignment of Case Thu 09/24 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Reassignment of Case Notice Date 09/23/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
32 32 order Reassign Case Mon 09/21 3:26 PM
Order to Reassign Case from Judge Carla E. Craig to Judge Louis A. Scarcella . Signed on 9/21/2020 (nds)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Thu 09/03 9:18 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: Brian Hufnagel Representing Debtor, Jeremy Sussman from the Office of the United States Trustee - Status hearing to be held on 10/14/2020 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Craig), Brooklyn, NY. Related [+] (tml)
Related: [-] 7 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Fri 07/24 1:26 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: Justin Ames Representing Creditgor, Brian J Hufnagel Representing Debtor, Jemery Sussman from the Office of the United States Trustee - Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 09/02/2020 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Craig), Brooklyn, NY. (tleonard)
Related: [-] 7 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Friday, June 19, 2020
31 31 court Transcript Court Ordered (Judge Craig Only) Fri 06/19 4:11 PM
Transcript & Notice regarding the hearing held on 05/13/20. Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the Office of the Clerk or may be purchased from the court transcriber. [Please see the court's website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency]. Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Due By 06/26/2020. Redaction Request Due By 07/10/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 07/20/2020. TRANSCRIPT ACCESS WILL BE ELECTRONICALLY RESTRICTED THROUGH 09/17/2020 AND MAY BE VIEWED AT THE OFFICE OF THE CLERK. (eScribers LLC)
Related: [-] 7 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Monday, May 18, 2020
30 30 order Authorizing Retention of Attorney (Ch11) Tue 05/19 10:18 AM
Order Authorizing Retention of Chapter 11 Attorney Morrison Tenenbaum PLLC., as Counsel to Debtor and Debtor-In-Possession effective as of November 9, 2019 Related [+]. Signed on 5/18/2020 (sem)
Related: [-] 23 Application to Employ filed by Debtor TAL on 1st Inc.
Wednesday, May 13, 2020
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Wed 05/13 3:14 PM
Telephonic Hearing Held and Adjourned; Related [+] - Appearances: Justin Ames Representing Creditor, Brian J Hufnagel Representing Debtor, Creditor' Counsel, Reema Lateef from the Office of the United States Trustee - Status hearing to be held on 07/22/2020 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Craig), Brooklyn, NY. (tleonard)
Related: [-] 7 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Wednesday, March 25, 2020
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned BK) Wed 03/25 1:24 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 05/13/2020 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Craig), Brooklyn, NY. (tleonard)
Related: [-] 7 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Tuesday, March 24, 2020
29 29 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Tue 03/24 10:57 AM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from March 25, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. to May 13, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. Filed by Brian J Hufnagel on behalf of TAL on 1st Inc. Related [+] (Hufnagel, Brian)
Related: [-] 7 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Thursday, February 27, 2020
28 28 court Transcript Court Ordered (Judge Craig Only) Thu 02/27 10:39 AM
Transcript & Notice regarding the hearing held on 02/12/20. Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the Office of the Clerk or may be purchased from the court transcriber. [Please see the court's website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency]. Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Due By 03/5/2020. Redaction Request Due By 03/19/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 03/30/2020. TRANSCRIPT ACCESS WILL BE ELECTRONICALLY RESTRICTED THROUGH 05/27/2020 AND MAY BE VIEWED AT THE OFFICE OF THE CLERK. (eScribers LLC)
Related: [-] 7 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Sunday, February 16, 2020
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Consolidation and Amend Caption Mon 02/17 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Consolidation and Amend Caption Notice Date 02/16/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2020
25 25 order Joint Administration Fri 02/14 3:37 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration on Lead Case: 19-46769 cec with Member Cases: 19-46770 cec, 19-46771 cec Related [+] Signed on 2/14/2020. (rjl)
Related: [-] 24
court Entry Fri 02/14 4:08 PM
Orders dated February 14, 2020, have been entered in the cases of LX Avenue Bagels, Inc., Amir Ram Bagels Inc., and Tal on 1st Inc. for consolidation of the cases for procedural purposes only and providing for the joint administration of the Debtors' cases. All docket entries are to be maintained on the docket of LX Avenue Bagels, Inc., Case no. 19-46769 (rjl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2020
26 26 order Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim Fri 02/14 3:42 PM
Order Establishing Deadline for filing Proofs of Claim and Approving the Form and Manner of Notice thereof Related [+] Signed on 2/13/2020. Proofs of Claims due by 3/27/2020. Government Proof of Claim due by 05/07/2020 . (fmr)
Related: [-] 22
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, February 12, 2020
24 24 motion Joint Administration Wed 02/12 10:20 AM
Motion for Joint Administration of Case LX Avenue Bagels Inc., Case No. 19-46769 with Case(s) Amir Ram Bagels Inc., Case No. 19-46770 and Tal on 1st Inc., Case No. 19-46771 Filed by Brian J Hufnagel on behalf of TAL on 1st Inc.. (Hufnagel, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
23 23 5 pgs motion Employ (Application) Wed 02/12 9:43 AM
Application to Employ Morrison Tenenbaum PLLC as Attorney for the Debtor Filed by Brian J Hufnagel on behalf of TAL on 1st Inc.. (Hufnagel, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affirmation of Lawrence F. Morrison
Att: 2 Proposed Order
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Wed 02/12 3:39 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Related [+] - Appearances: Brian J Hufnagel Representing Debtor, Reema Lateef from the Office of the United States Trustee - Status hearing to be held on 03/25/2020 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Craig), Brooklyn, NY. (tleonard)
Related: [-] 7 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
22 22 motion Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Tue 02/11 4:01 PM
Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Filed by Brian J Hufnagel on behalf of TAL on 1st Inc.. (Hufnagel, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Notice of Bar Date
Att: 2 Proposed Order
21 21 misc Small Business Monthly Operating Report Tue 02/11 2:12 PM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period Amended November 2019 Filed by Lawrence Morrison on behalf of TAL on 1st Inc. (Morrison, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
20 20 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Wed 01/22 3:12 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from January 22, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. to February 12, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. Filed by Lawrence Morrison on behalf of TAL on 1st Inc. (Morrison, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned BK) Sun 01/26 10:05 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 02/12/2020 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Craig), Brooklyn, NY. (tleonard)
Related: [-] 7 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Friday, January 17, 2020
19 19 misc Small Business Monthly Operating Report Fri 01/17 2:52 PM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period December 2019 Filed by Lawrence Morrison on behalf of TAL on 1st Inc. (Morrison, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2020
18 18 misc Refiled Petition Re: Forms Modernization 2015 (Pgs 1-4) for Non-Individuals Wed 01/08 6:14 PM
Refiled Petition Re: Forms Modernization 2015 (Pgs 1-4)for Non-Individuals; Includes trading name. Filed by Lawrence Morrison on behalf of TAL on 1st Inc. Related [+] (Morrison, Lawrence)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor TAL on 1st Inc.
Thursday, January 02, 2020
17 17 misc Small Business Monthly Operating Report Thu 01/02 6:26 PM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period November 2019 Filed by Lawrence Morrison on behalf of TAL on 1st Inc. (Morrison, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2019
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing wih Copy of Order Fri 12/13 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Copy of Order Notice Date 12/12/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2019
14 14 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Tue 12/10 12:58 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Lawrence Morrison on behalf of TAL on 1st Inc. Related [+] (Morrison, Lawrence)
Related: [-] Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned BK)
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 12/10 12:36 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Joseph Moldovan on behalf of EAST 21 RETAIL LLC (Moldovan, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2019
15 15 order Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Tue 12/10 3:12 PM
Ordered, that the Debtor is granted an extension to December 6th, 2019 to file to file the Missing Documents set forth above. Related [+] Signed on 12/9/2019. (fmr)
Related: [-] 9
trustee Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Mon 12/09 5:02 PM
Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. 341(a) Meeting Adjourned to 12/20/2019 at 04:00 PM at Room 2579, 271-C Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, NY. (Wolf, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2019
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Thu 12/05 10:56 AM
Receipt of Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) (Fee Due)(1 19-46771 cec) [misc,schsfa] ( 31.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18732532. Fee amount 31.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#12
Wednesday, December 04, 2019
12 12 misc Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) (Fee Due) Wed 12/04 7:08 PM
Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, : Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Compensation for Attorneys for Debtor, and Affidavit 1007-1(B) Fee Amount $31 Filed by Lawrence Morrison on behalf of TAL on 1st Inc. (Morrison, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Wed 12/04 1:57 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from December 4, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. to January 22, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. Filed by Lawrence Morrison on behalf of TAL on 1st Inc. Related [+] (Morrison, Lawrence)
Related: [-] 7 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
10 10 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Wed 12/04 11:46 AM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from December 4, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. to January 22, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. Filed by Lawrence Morrison on behalf of TAL on 1st Inc. (Morrison, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned BK) Mon 12/09 8:39 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] - Status hearing to be held on 01/22/2020 at 03:00 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Craig), Brooklyn, NY. (tleonard)
Related: [-] 7 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Sunday, December 01, 2019
9 9 motion Extend Deadline to File Schedules Sun 12/01 11:51 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Lawrence Morrison on behalf of TAL on 1st Inc.. (Morrison, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 17, 2019
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Mon 11/18 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 11/17/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2019
7 7 order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference (Ch 11) All Judges Fri 11/15 9:38 AM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference. Signed on 11/15/2019 Status hearing to be held on 12/4/2019 at 03:30 PM at Courtroom 3529 (Judge Craig), Brooklyn, NY. (tml)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2019
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Fri 11/15 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 11/14/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Fri 11/15 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 11/14/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing Fri 11/15 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing Notice Date 11/14/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2019
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Tue 11/12 3:36 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/9/2019 at 11:00 AM at Room 2579, 271-C Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, NY. (tmg)
Related: [-]
court Case Related to a Chapter 11 Tue 11/12 8:37 AM
The above case is related to 19-46769 cec LX Avenue Bagels Inc. and 19-46770 cec Amir Ram Bagels Inc. filed 11/9/19 (cjm)
Related: [-]
utility Judge Reassignment Utility Tue 11/12 8:38 AM
Judge Nancy Hershey Lord removed from the case due to Related Case, Judge Reassigned. Judge Carla Craig added to the case. (cjm)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 09, 2019
2 2 court Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Tue 11/12 9:44 AM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 11/9/2019. Small Business Balance Sheet due by 11/18/2019. Small Business Cash Flow Statement due by 11/18/2019. Small Business Statement of Operations due by 11/18/2019. Small Business Tax Return due by 11/18/2019. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. 11 U.S.C. § 329 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2016(b) (Official Form 2030) due 11/25/2019. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 11/25/2019. Schedule A/B due 11/25/2019. Schedule D due 11/25/2019. Schedule E/F due 11/25/2019. Schedule G due 11/25/2019. Schedule H due 11/25/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 11/25/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 11/25/2019. (tmg)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sat 11/09 12:52 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Lawrence Morrison on behalf of TAL ON 1ST INC. Chapter 11 Plan - Small Business - due by 05/7/2020. Chapter 11 Small Business Disclosure Statement due by 05/7/2020. (Morrison, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Sat 11/09 12:57 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(1 19-46771 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18642149. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1