Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:19-cv-02012
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 12, 2019
Case in other court:Ohio Northern, 3:19-cv-02012
Last checked: Sunday May 10, 2020 1:43 AM PDT
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Plaintiff
James Vollmar
Represented By
Wesley Dean Merillat
Charles E. Boyk Law Offices, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, November 12, 2019
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 11/12 12:59 PM
Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ajsS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 11/12 9:29 AM
Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-02012. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2019
3 3 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 163) by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In Re: MDL 2741 Roundup Products Liability Litigation. Case transferred to the Northern District of California and assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria. (P,R)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
2 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Monsanto Company. (M,L)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (M,L)
Related: [-]
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L)
Related: [-]
Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant. Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (M,L)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
1 1 Complaint with jury demand against Monsanto Company. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9500309.. Filed by James Vollmar. (Merillat, Wesley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons