Maryland District Court
Judge:Stephanie A Gallagher
Case #: 1:19-cv-03259
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Nov 12, 2019
Terminated:Aug 13, 2021
Last checked: Sunday May 10, 2020 5:49 AM EDT
Defendant
HIC Energy Partners, LLC
4801 Lang Avenue NE Suite 110
Albuquerque, NM 87109
Defendant
Troy Holland
1501 King William Drive
Catonsville, MD 21228
Defendant
Holcap LLC
1501 King Williams Drive
Catonsville, MD 21228
Defendant
Teresa Y. Holland
1501 King William Drive
Catonsville, MD 21228
Represented By
Anissa Jai Bonner
The Bonner Firm, PC
contact info
Defendant
Angela Marcos
5 Sunup Court
Reistertown, MD 21136
Plaintiff
ConocoPhillips Company
925 North Eldridge Parkway
Houston, TX 77079
Represented By
Henry Mark Stichel
Astrachan Gunst Thomas, P.C.
contact info
Trisha L Scott
Astrachan Gunst Thomas, P.C.
contact info
Donna M D Thomas
Astrachan Gunst Thomas PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Warren A. Brown
Terminated: 04/02/2020
Defendant
Warren A. Brown, P.A.
Terminated: 04/02/2020
3004 Hilton Street
Baltimore, MD 21216
Defendant
Cohen & Forman, LLC
Terminated: 12/16/2019
Defendant
UT Baltimore County, LLC
Terminated: 04/15/2020

GPO Feb 07 2020
ORDER denying 50 Motion to Dismiss; denying 51 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/7/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 2.7.2020)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, August 13, 2021
109 109 order Judgment - Consent Judgment - Default Mon 08/16 1:45 PM
CONSENT JUDGMENT, DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of ConocoPhillips Company against HIC Energy Partners, LLC. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/13/2021. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
108 108 order Order Fri 08/13 3:15 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER Approving106 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Angela Marcos Only filed by ConocoPhillips Company. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/13/2021. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
107 107 corresp Status Report Submitted Fri 08/13 2:04 PM
Status Report Submitted by ConocoPhillips Company Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03259-SAG, 1:21-cv-01822-SAG(Stichel, Henry)
Related: [-]
106 106 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 08/13 1:08 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Angela Marcos Only by ConocoPhillips CompanyAssociated Cases: 1:19-cv-03259-SAG, 1:21-cv-01822-SAG(Stichel, Henry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 12, 2021
105 105 order Order Thu 08/12 3:58 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER Approving103 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Teresa Holland Only filed by ConocoPhillips Company. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/12/2021. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 11, 2021
104 104 notice Notice (Other) Wed 08/11 9:27 AM
NOTICE by ConocoPhillips Company re (101 in 1:19-cv-03259-SAG) Joint MOTION for Judgment Proposed Order Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03259-SAG, 1:21-cv-01822-SAG(Stichel, Henry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 10, 2021
103 103 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 08/10 4:39 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Teresa Holland Only by ConocoPhillips CompanyAssociated Cases: 1:19-cv-03259-SAG, 1:21-cv-01822-SAG(Stichel, Henry)
Related: [-]
102 102 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Tue 08/10 10:02 AM
QC NOTICE:101 Motion for Judgment filed by ConocoPhillips Company was filed incorrectly. ***Please file a proposed order using the event> Notice > Notice(Other) and link to original motion (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 09, 2021
101 101 motion Judgment Mon 08/09 6:04 PM
Joint MOTION for Judgment by ConocoPhillips CompanyAssociated Cases: 1:19-cv-03259-SAG, 1:21-cv-01822-SAG(Stichel, Henry)
Related: [-]
100 100 corresp Status Report Submitted Mon 08/09 6:01 PM
Status Report Submitted by ConocoPhillips Company Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03259-SAG, 1:21-cv-01822-SAG(Stichel, Henry)
Related: [-]