Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10512

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Joseph G Rosania Jr
Case #: 1:19-ap-01337
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 11, 2019
Terminated:Jul 23, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Two Rivers Water & Farming Company
Registered Agent 3025 South Parker Rd., Ste. 140
Aurora, CO 80014
Represented By
Two Rivers Water & Farming Company
contact info
Defendant
TR Capital Partners, LLC
Registered Agent 3025 South Parker Rd., Ste. 140
Aurora, CO 80014
Represented By
TR Capital Partners, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
GrowCo, Inc.
456 Madison Street
Denver, CO 80217
Represented By
David Wadsworth
Wadsworth Garber Warner Conrardy, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Friday, July 23, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Fri 07/23 9:08 AM
Adversary Case Number 19-01337 JGR Closed. Related [+]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 19, 2021
48 48 1 pgs court Returned Mail Mon 07/19 3:28 PM
Returned Mail For GrowCo, Inc. Regarding Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Doc #46) Related [+].
Related: [-] 46 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Friday, July 09, 2021
47 47 3 pgs court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 07/09 10:19 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/09/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 46 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
46 46 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 07/07 7:49 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. (dg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 07/07 7:50 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 19-01337 JGR. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 7/21/2021-Review to close. (dg)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 05, 2020
45 45 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 12/05 10:17 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 12/05/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 44 Generic Order
Thursday, December 03, 2020
44 44 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 12/03 12:48 PM
Notice of No Action Related [+]. (dg)
Related: [-] 40 Motion
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
43 43 answer Reply Tue 11/17 8:57 PM
Reply Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of TR Capital Partners, LLC, Two Rivers Water & Farming Company Related [+]. (Buechler, Kelsey)
Related: [-] 40 Motion
Tuesday, November 10, 2020
42 42 answer Response Tue 11/10 5:23 PM
Response Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of GrowCo, Inc. Related [+]. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-] 40 Motion
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
41 41 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/27 9:36 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of TR Capital Partners, LLC, Two Rivers Water & Farming Company Related [+]. (Buechler, Kelsey)
Related: [-] 22 Amended Complaint
40 40 motion Motion Tue 10/27 9:35 AM
Motion For Set Aside Clerk's Default Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of TR Capital Partners, LLC, Two Rivers Water & Farming Company Related [+]. (Buechler, Kelsey)
Related: [-] 34 Clerks Entry of Default
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Thursday, October 01, 2020
39 39 notice Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 10/01 12:32 PM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of Two Rivers Water & Farming Company. (Buechler, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 25, 2020
38 38 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 07/27 8:33 AM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/25/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 37 Order to Hold Case In Abeyance
Thursday, July 23, 2020
37 37 order Abeyance Thu 07/23 2:34 PM
Order To Hold Case In Abeyance Related [+]. (dg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,36 Motion for Default Judgment
Monday, July 06, 2020
36 36 4 pgs motion Default Judgment Mon 07/06 1:43 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Against Two Rivers Water & Farming Company Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of GrowCo, Inc.. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Verification
Att: 2 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Att: 3 Proposed/Unsigned Order Judgment
Thursday, June 25, 2020
35 35 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 06/25 10:24 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/25/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34 Clerks Entry of Default
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
34 34 order Virtual Clerks Entry of Default Tue 06/23 4:31 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default As To Two Rivers Water & Farming Company Related [+].
Related: [-] 33 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default
Monday, June 22, 2020
33 33 motion Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 06/22 10:28 AM
Motion For Clerk's Entry of Default Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of GrowCo, Inc. Related [+]. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-] 22 Amended Complaint
Att: 1 Other Verification
Att: 2 Proposed/Unsigned Order Entry
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 06/10 10:28 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 06/10/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31 Order to Show Cause
Monday, June 08, 2020
31 31 order Show Cause Mon 06/08 1:52 PM
Order to Show Cause for Plaintiff to advance administration of Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Show Cause Response due date 6/22/2020 (dg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,22 Amended Complaint
Saturday, April 18, 2020
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 04/18 10:22 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/18/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thursday, April 16, 2020
29 29 order Withdraw As Attorney Thu 04/16 10:57 AM
Order Granting Motion To Withdraw As Attorney Related [+]. (dg)
Related: [-] 26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tuesday, April 14, 2020
28 28 misc Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Wed 04/15 6:43 AM
Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Filed by Herbert R Donica on behalf of TR Capital Partners, LLC , Two Rivers Water & Farming Company Related [+]. (dg)
Related: [-] 26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
27 27 notice Notice Tue 04/14 4:59 PM
Incorrect Event Used. Please see document #28. Notice Re: CERTIFICATE OF NON-CONTESTED MATTER AND REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF ORDER. Filed by Herbert R Donica on behalf of TR Capital Partners, LLC, Two Rivers Water & Farming Company Related [+]. (Donica, Herbert) Modified on 4/15/2020 (dg)
Related: [-] 26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thursday, April 02, 2020
26 26 motion Withdraw As Attorney Thu 04/02 10:41 AM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Filed by Herbert R Donica on behalf of TR Capital Partners, LLC, Two Rivers Water & Farming Company. (Donica, Herbert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Att: 2 Other Notice of Motion
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, April 01, 2020
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/01 10:35 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 04/01/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order on Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Monday, March 30, 2020
24 24 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Mon 03/30 3:06 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint TR Capital Partners, LLC Answer Due 4/17/2020; Two Rivers Water & Farming Company Answer Due 4/17/2020 Related [+]. (dg)
Related: [-] 23 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Friday, March 27, 2020
23 23 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Fri 03/27 3:29 PM
Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Herbert R Donica on behalf of TR Capital Partners, LLC, Two Rivers Water & Farming Company Related [+]. (Donica, Herbert)
Related: [-] 22 Amended Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, March 20, 2020
22 22 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/20 9:43 AM
Amended Complaint Nature of Suit 02 (Other Actions) by GrowCo, Inc. against Two Rivers Water & Farming Company. Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of GrowCo, Inc. Related [+]. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Tuesday, March 10, 2020
21 21 order Minutes of Proceedings/Minute Order Wed 03/11 12:34 PM
Minutes of Proceeding regarding the Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Cause of Action or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by Two Rivers Water & Farming Company, and TR Capital Partners, LLC on December 24, 2019 (Doc. 10), and the Debtor's Response thereto filed January 28, 2020 (Doc. 18). Related [+].IT IS ORDERED as follows:1. The Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Cause of Action or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by Two Rivers Water & Farming Company, and TR Capital Partners, LLC on December 24, 2019 (Doc. 10) is GRANTED IN PART as to the Second, Third, and Fourth Claims for Relief, which are dismissed without prejudice.2. The Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Cause of Action or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by Two Rivers Water & Farming Company, and TR Capital Partners, LLC on December 24, 2019 (Doc. 10) is DENIED IN PART as to the First Claim for Relief.3. The Plaintiff shall forthwith file an Amended Complaint. 4. The Defendant shall have until and including 14 days after the filing of the AmendedComplaint to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint.
Related: [-] 10 Motion for More Definite Statement
Friday, February 14, 2020
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/14 10:25 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 02/14/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order Setting Hearing
Wednesday, February 12, 2020
19 19 order Set Hearing (Adversary) Wed 02/12 12:30 PM
Order Setting Hearing Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 3/10/2020 at 02:00 PM Courtroom B . (dg)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for More Definite Statement
Tuesday, January 28, 2020
18 18 answer Response Tue 01/28 3:35 PM
Response Filed by David Warner on behalf of GrowCo, Inc. Related [+]. (Warner, David)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for More Definite Statement,16 Order on Motion to Extend Time-Adversary
Friday, January 24, 2020
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 01/24 10:31 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/24/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Motion to Extend Time-Adversary
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
16 16 order Extend Time (Adversary) Wed 01/22 12:42 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+]. Response due by 1/28/2020 (dg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,10 Motion for More Definite Statement,15 Motion to Extend Time
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
15 15 motion Extend Time (Adversary) Tue 01/21 10:48 AM
Second Motion to Extend Time Due To Other Reasons To to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Filed by David Warner on behalf of GrowCo, Inc. Related [+]. (Warner, David)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion to Extend Time-Adversary
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Friday, January 10, 2020
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 01/10 10:46 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/10/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion to Extend Time-Adversary
Wednesday, January 08, 2020
13 13 order Extend Time (Adversary) Wed 01/08 11:51 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Related [+]. Response due by 1/21/2020 (dg)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for More Definite Statement,12 Motion to Extend Time
Tuesday, January 07, 2020
12 12 motion Extend Time (Adversary) Tue 01/07 3:53 PM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time Due To Other Reasons To Respond to Motion to Dismiss Filed by David Warner on behalf of GrowCo, Inc. Related [+]. (Warner, David)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for More Definite Statement
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, December 26, 2019
11 11 utility Notification of Electronic Filing Error (Public Entry) Thu 12/26 6:12 AM
Notice of Electronic Filing Error. Attorney Donica is hereby notified of the following error in docket number 10: A proposed order was not submitted with the motion . E-Filer shall email a proposed order in PDF format to cob_jgr_ecforders@cob.uscourts.gov. Failure to timely correct the error may result in the party not receiving the requested relief. (Text Only Entry) Related [+]. (dg)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for More Definite Statement
Tuesday, December 24, 2019
10 10 motion More Definite Statement Tue 12/24 1:44 PM
Motion for More Definite Statement Filed by Herbert R Donica on behalf of TR Capital Partners, LLC, Two Rivers Water & Farming Company Related [+]. (Donica, Herbert)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, December 23, 2019
9 9 notice Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 12/23 1:33 PM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Herbert R Donica on behalf of TR Capital Partners, LLC, Two Rivers Water & Farming Company. (Donica, Herbert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
8 8 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Document Tue 12/17 4:22 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Document Filed by David Warner on behalf of GrowCo, Inc. Related [+]. (Warner, David)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default
Monday, December 16, 2019
7 7 motion Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 12/16 4:00 PM
Motion For Clerk's Entry of Default Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of GrowCo, Inc. Related [+]. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,4 Summons Issued (auto),5 Summons Service Executed-Adversary
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Att: 2 Proposed/Unsigned Order Entry of Default
Wednesday, December 11, 2019
6 6 notice Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 12/11 8:30 AM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by David Warner on behalf of GrowCo, Inc.. (Warner, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2019
5 5 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Mon 11/11 3:47 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Two Rivers Water & Farming Company and TR Capital Partners, LLC on 11/11/19 Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of GrowCo, Inc.. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 11/11 3:42 PM
Summons Issued on TR Capital Partners, LLC Answer Due 12/11/2019. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 11/11 3:42 PM
Summons Issued on Two Rivers Water & Farming Company Answer Due 12/11/2019. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 11/11 3:40 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 19-01337 JGR] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A27759247. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/11 3:38 PM
Adversary case 19-01337 Complaint by GrowCo, Inc. against Two Rivers Water & Farming Company, TR Capital Partners, LLC. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 03/10/2020 (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1