Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-04676
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2019
Terminated:Jul 28, 2022
Last checked: Monday May 11, 2020 6:29 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
JOSHUA FALGOUT
Represented By
MIKAL WATTS
Watts Guerra Llp - San Antonio Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, July 28, 2022
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 08/04 1:44 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a Court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/28/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 03/03 3:26 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT -SHORT FORM- against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by JOSHUA FALGOUT. (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/13 3:48 PM
COMPLAINT -SHORT FORM- against All Defendants, filed by JOSHUA FALGOUT. (WATTS, MIKAL)
Related: [-]