Alabama Middle District Court
Judge:William Keith Watkins
Referred: Stephen Michael Doyle
Case #: 2:19-cv-00861
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2019
Terminated:Dec 05, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday May 06, 2020 3:22 AM CDT
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
6 Office Park Circle #100
Mountain Brooke, AL 35223
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD.
Defendant
TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
6 Office Park Circle #100
Mountain Brooke, AL 35523
Defendant
Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
641 South Lawrence Street
Montgomery, AL 36104
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
2 North Jackson Street, Suite 605
Montgomery, AL 36104
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
2 North Jackson Street, Suite 605
Montgomery, AL 36104
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
641 South Lawrence Street
Montgomery, AL 36104
Defendant
Mallinckrodt, PLC
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
2 North Jackson Street, Suite 605
Montgomery, AL 36104
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
2 North Jackson Street, Suite 605
Montgomery, AL 36104
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
The Corporation Company 2000 Intersate Park Drive Suite 204
Montgomery, AL 36109
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
Defendant
Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By
John Patrick Strubel
Watkins & Eager, PLLC
contact info
David Lee Brown, Jr.
Watkins & Eager, PLLC
contact info
Houston Lanier Brown, II
Watkins & Eager PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
Actavis, LLC
Plaintiff
City of Brundidge, Alabama
Represented By
Jon Ryan Kral
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles PC
contact info
Jeffrey Donald Price
Beasley Allen Law Firm
contact info
William Robert Sutton
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles PC
contact info
Richard Douglas Stratton
Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles
contact info
Rhon Eugene Jones
Beasley Allen Crown Methvin Portis & Miles PC
contact info
Jere Locke Beasley
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, December 11, 2019
misc Docket Annotation Wed 12/11 10:49 AM
Received email from OHND regarding receipt of e-transfer case; OHND case number assigned as 1:19-op-46128. (No pdf attached to this entry).(kh, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2019
25 25 misc Docket Annotation Thu 12/05 2:41 PM
Received certified copy of Conditional Transfer order entered on 12/5/2015 by the Judicial Panel on Multi District Litigation transferring this action to the USDC for the Northern District of Ohio. (kh, )
Related: [-]
utility Case Transferred Out - District Thu 12/05 2:43 PM
Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to clerk. (kh, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2019
24 24 service Return Receipt Card Tue 12/03 9:46 AM
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by A.V. for Purdue Pharma, Inc. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (kh, )
Related: [-]
23 23 service Return Receipt Card Tue 12/03 9:40 AM
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by (illegible) for Johnson & Johnson served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (kh, )
Related: [-]
22 22 service Return Receipt Card Tue 12/03 8:57 AM
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by CT Corporation for Endo Health Solutions, Inc. served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Mallinckrodt LLC served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (kh, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2019
21 21 service Return Receipt Card Mon 12/02 8:47 AM
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by Paul S. for The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (kh, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2019
20 20 service Return Receipt Card Tue 11/26 11:12 AM
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by D. Kelley for Cardinal Health, Inc. served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (kh, )
Related: [-]
19 19 service Return Receipt Card Tue 11/26 11:08 AM
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by (illegible) for Cephalon, Inc. served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (kh, )
Related: [-]
18 18 service Return Receipt Card Tue 11/26 10:58 AM
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by M. Wyatt for Watson Laboratories, Inc. served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (kh, )
Related: [-]
17 17 service Return Receipt Card Tue 11/26 10:56 AM
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by C.S. for Actavis, LLC served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (kh, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2019
7 7 misc Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement Fri 11/22 10:08 AM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Strubel, John)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/22 10:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Patrick Strubel on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Strubel, John)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/22 10:06 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Houston Lanier Brown, II on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, Houston)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/22 10:05 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Lee Brown, Jr on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2019
16 16 service Return Receipt Card Fri 11/22 4:34 PM
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons &1 Complaint, signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Noramco, Inc., served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (amf, )
Related: [-]
15 15 service Return Receipt Card Fri 11/22 4:32 PM
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons &1 Complaint, signed by Julie Buckner for TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (amf, )
Related: [-]
14 14 service Return Receipt Card Fri 11/22 4:31 PM
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons &1 Complaint, signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (amf, )
Related: [-]
13 13 service Return Receipt Card Fri 11/22 4:30 PM
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons &1 Complaint, signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (amf, )
Related: [-]
12 12 service Return Receipt Card Fri 11/22 4:28 PM
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons &1 Complaint, signed by Kelly Webster for Purdue Pharma L.P., served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (amf, )
Related: [-]
11 11 service Return Receipt Card Fri 11/22 4:23 PM
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons &1 Complaint, signed by Kelly Webster for McKesson Corporation, served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (amf, )
Related: [-]
10 10 service Return Receipt Card Fri 11/22 4:21 PM
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons &1 Complaint, signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (amf, )
Related: [-]
9 9 service Return Receipt Card Fri 11/22 4:20 PM
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons &1 Complaint, signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (amf, )
Related: [-]
8 8 service Return Receipt Card Fri 11/22 4:18 PM
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons &1 Complaint, signed by Julie Buckner for Actavis Pharma, Inc., served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (amf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2019
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 11/18 11:06 AM
Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and CMRRR with copy of1 complaint. (kh, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2019
2 2 misc Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement Wed 11/13 12:51 PM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by City of Brundidge, Alabama. (kh, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/13 12:45 PM
COMPLAINT against Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602055643.), filed by City of Brundidge, Alabama.(kh, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Filing Fee Receipt
misc Jury Demand Wed 11/13 12:49 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by City of Brundidge, Alabama. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry1 for pdf)(kh, )
Related: [-]