Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-04732
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday May 12, 2020 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
PATRICK LUNSFORD
2 Natures Ridge Circle, SE
Huntsville, AL 35803
Represented By
ADAM J LANGINO
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll - Raleigh Nc
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
3 3 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 05/10 12:26 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Adam J. Langino by PATRICK LUNSFORD. (KROEGER, LESLIE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 05, 2022
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/05 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LESLIE KROEGER on behalf of PATRICK LUNSFORD (KROEGER, LESLIE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/14 10:19 AM
COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF, PATRICK LUNSFORD, against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4701834.), filed by PATRICK LUNSFORD. (LANGINO, ADAM)
Related: [-]