Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Julia K Munley
Case #: 3:19-cv-01959
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2019
Terminated:Apr 26, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 12, 2020 5:05 AM EDT
Defendant
Microtel Inn & Suites by Keyser
Represented By
William P. Cech
Law Offices Of Robert T. Panowicz & Associates
contact info
Robert T. Panowicz
contact info
Defendant
Microtel Inn & Suites by Wyndham
Represented By
William P. Cech
Law Offices Of Robert T. Panowicz & Associates
contact info
Robert T. Panowicz
contact info
Defendant
Messenger Hospitality, Inc.
2063 Winners Drive
Pleasant Valley, WV 26554
Represented By
William P. Cech
Law Offices Of Robert T. Panowicz & Associates
contact info
Defendant
Microtel Inns & Suites Franchising, Inc.
22 Sylvan Way
Parsippany, NJ 07054
Represented By
William P. Cech
Law Offices Of Robert T. Panowicz & Associates
contact info
Mediator
Mediator
Represented By
Joseph Anthony Barrett
Office Of Clerk Of Court
contact info
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Bator
Represented By
Jeremy R Weinstock
Comitz Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Jonathan S. Comitz
Comitz Law Firm, LLC
contact info

GPO Dec 12 2023
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Messenger Hospitality, Inc. Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 12/12/23. (sm)
GPO Apr 26 2024
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 62 Supplemental MOTION for Reconsideration Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 4/26/24. (sm)
GPO Apr 26 2024
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), VACATING the Court's order of 12/12/2446 ; Dft is directed to forward a physical media video (exhibit 3) to the Clerk of Court's file; GRANTING the defendant's supplemental Motion for Reconsideration62 thereby granting the defendant's motion for summary judgment 38; - Summary Judgment is entered in favor of the Defendant, Messenger hospitality and against the Plaintiff Elizabeth Bator; and Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 4/26/24. (sm)

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
74 74 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Tue 10/15 12:31 PM
ORDER DENYING as moot66 Motion for Reconsideration, re73 Letter from Pltf counsel. Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 10/15/24 (sm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
73 73 misc Letter Mon 10/14 2:35 PM
Letter from Jeremy Weinstock . (Weinstock, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
72 72 2 pgs order Order Thu 10/10 2:34 PM
ORDER DIRECTING parties to file status report w/i 10 days re66 motion for reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 10/10/24. (sm)
Related: [-]