Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Claude M Hilton
Referred: Ivan D Davis
Case #: 1:19-cv-01453
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2019
Terminated:Jan 06, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday May 13, 2020 4:49 AM EDT
Defendant
By Light Professional IT Services, LLC
Represented By
Sherron Netria Thomas McClain
The Farrington Law Firm LLC
contact info
Defendant
Phacil, Inc.
Represented By
Sherron Netria Thomas McClain
The Farrington Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lori Faye Fischler
Represented By
Carla Denette Brown
Charlson Bredehoft Cohen & Brown PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, January 06, 2020
10 10 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 01/07 11:44 AM
SO ORDERED re9 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 01/06/2020. (dvanm, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2019
9 9 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 12/27 10:09 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Phacil, Inc.. (Thomas McClain, Sherron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2019
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 12/04 3:37 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be filed on or before 12/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 12/4/2019. (rban, )
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 12/04 2:30 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint by By Light Professional IT Services, LLC, Phacil, Inc..(Thomas McClain, Sherron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 19, 2019
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/19 4:48 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lori Faye Fischler Phacil, Inc. served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019 (Brown, Carla)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/19 4:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lori Faye Fischler By Light Professional IT Services, LLC served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019 (Brown, Carla)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2019
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 11/18 9:08 AM
Summons Issued as to By Light Professional IT Services, LLC, Phacil, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint.(dvanm, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Friday, November 15, 2019
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Fri 11/15 12:06 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint for Defendant By Light Professional IT Services LLC by Lori Faye Fischler. (Brown, Carla)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 11/15 12:05 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint for Defendant Phacil, Inc. by Lori Faye Fischler. (Brown, Carla)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/15 12:01 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6940638.), filed by Lori Faye Fischler.(Brown, Carla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Fri 11/15 3:13 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (dvanm, )
Related: [-]