New York Southern District Court
Judge:Edgardo Ramos
Case #: 1:19-cv-10595
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2019
Terminated:Apr 16, 2024
Case in other court:Supreme Court of the State of NY, New York County, 101436/2019
Last checked: Wednesday May 13, 2020 4:18 AM EDT
Defendant
Ali Baba's Terrace, Inc.
Represented By
Diane Krebs
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Senol Bakir
Represented By
Diane Krebs
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Ali Riza Dogan
Represented By
Diane Krebs
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Tolgahan Subakan
Represented By
Diane Krebs
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Mehmet Emin Tatas
26 Devine Street
Lynbrook, NY 11563
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Admiral Insurance
Terminated: 04/29/2020
Represented By
Benjamin Phillip Mark
Coughlin Duffy LLP
contact info
Adam Mason Smith
Coughlin Duffy, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
265 265 9 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Wed 04/23 9:08 AM
OPINION & ORDER re:261 MOTION to Stay filed by Mehmet Emin Tatas. For the foregoing reasons, Tatas' motion for stay is DENIED unless Tatas posts a supersedeas bond by April 30, 2025. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion, Doc. 261. It is SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/22/2025) (mml) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers)
Related: [-]