Lowe v. NBT Bank, N.A.
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mae A D'Agostino |
Referred: | Miroslav Lovric |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-01400 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1335 Interpleader Action |
Case Filed: | Nov 13, 2019 |
Terminated: | Sep 30, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday May 11, 2020 6:30 AM EDT |
Defendant
NBT Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Lowe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
105 | 105
order
Judgment
Fri 09/30 10:17 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of B Squeaky Clean LLC, Christopher Lowe, Colin Wood, Marietta Propersi, Regina Bozic against NBT Bank, N.A.. (ban) |
|
Att: 1 Appeal Notice | ||
104 | 104
24
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 09/30 10:00 PM
FINAL APPROVAL ORDER APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS, AND SERVICE AWARDS. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 9/30/22. (ban) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2022 | ||
103 | 103
misc
Letter Brief
Thu 09/29 1:51 PM
LETTER BRIEF Submitting Further Revised Proposed Final Order Approving Class Action Settlement and Granting Application for Attorneys' Fees and Costs, and Service Awards by B Squeaky Clean LLC, Regina Bozic, Christopher Lowe, Marietta Propersi, Colin Wood.(Bilsborrow, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order/Judgment | ||
minutes
Omnibus Hearing
Thu 09/29 1:10 PM
TEXT Minute Entry for Final Approval Hearing held on 9/29/2022 before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino: Appearances by Jeffrey Kaliel, Esq. appearing in person for the Plaintiffs with Taras Kick, Esq. (appearing remotely); Brian Whiteley, Esq. appearing in person for defendants; The Court finds that the proposed settlement is fair, reasonable, and adequate; The Settlement is Approved in all respects; The Court also determines that the certification is proper. The Service Awards for the 5 named plaintiff's is appropriate and accepted; The Court finds that the attorneys fees and costs are reasonable at 33.33%. Counsel advise the Court of one typo in the final order, but will file a corrected order on the docket. Once the corrected order is filed, the Court will approve it. (Court Reporter Jacqueline Stroffolino, CRD Britney Norton [Time 11:01 a.m. - 11:21 a.m.]) (ban) |
||
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
102 | 102
misc
Letter Brief
Wed 09/28 8:25 PM
LETTER BRIEF Submitting Revised Proposed Final Approval Order by B Squeaky Clean LLC, Regina Bozic, Christopher Lowe, Marietta Propersi, Colin Wood.(Bilsborrow, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order/Judgment | ||
101 | 101
order
Order on Letter Request
Wed 09/28 2:55 PM
TEXT ORDER granting100 Letter Motion from Taras Kick for Christopher Lowe requesting Leave to Appear Remotely at The Final Approval Hearing set for Sept 29, 2022: It is hereby ORDERED that Attorney Kick's request for leave to appear remotely for the Final Approval Hearing scheduled for 9/29/2022 at 11:00 AM in Albany before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino, is GRANTED; The Clerk will provide Mr. Kick with a Teams link. He should use the link to join the proceeding on 9/29/22. ALL other counsel who plan to attend the final approval hearing must appear in person, unless otherwise directed by the Court. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 9/28/22. (ban) |
|
Tuesday, September 27, 2022 | ||
100 | 100
motion
Letter Request/Motion
Tue 09/27 8:44 PM
Letter Motion from Taras Kick for Christopher Lowe requesting Leave to Appear Remotely at The Final Approval Hearing set for Sept 29, 2022 submitted to Judge Mae Avila D'Agostino . (Kick, Taras) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2022 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 09/26 2:20 PM
TEXT NOTICE Re-SETTING FINAL APPROVAL HEARING (Time Change Only): The Final Approval Hearing set for 9/29/2022 at 12:00 p.m. is RESET due to a conflict with the Court's calendar. The Final Approval Hearing is reset for 9/29/2022 at 11:00 AM in Albany before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino. (ban) |