Vermont District Court
Case #: 2:19-cr-00151
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Nov 16, 2019 2:19 AM EST
Defendant
Jennifer MacDonald (1)
Represented By
Robert S. Behrens, Esq.
Behrens Venman, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Nicole P. Cate, AUSA
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/16/2019 3:49 AM EST
Monday, November 04, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jennifer MacDonald. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 11/4/2019. (eh) [2:19-mj-00193-jmc]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Kristian Pinkham
3 3 MOTION to Seal1 Complaint and Arrest Warrant by USA as to Jennifer MacDonald. (eh) [2:19-mj-00193-jmc]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal as to Jennifer MacDonald.1 Complaint and this Order are sealed until the arrest of the defendant. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 11/4/2019. (eh) [2:19-mj-00193-jmc]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2019
RECEIVED Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum by USA as to Jennifer MacDonald. (law) [2:19-mj-00193-jmc]
Related: [-]
CJA 20: Appointment of Robert S. Behrens, Esq for Jennifer MacDonald. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/6/2019. (law) [2:19-mj-00193-jmc]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2019
6 6 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jennifer MacDonald: Initial Appearance set for 11/14/2019 1:00 PM in Burlington Courtroom 440 before Judge John M. Conroy. (hbc) [2:19-mj-00193-jmc]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2019
7 7 INDICTMENT as to Jennifer MacDonald (1) count(s) 1. (pac)
Related: [-]
8 8 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Jennifer MacDonald. (Cate, Nicole)
Related: [-]
9 9 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John M. Conroy: Initial Appearance and Arraignment as to Jennifer MacDonald held on 11/14/2019. Nathanael Burris, AUSA present for the gov't and deft present with Atty Robert Behrens. Court informs deft of rights. Deft sworn and Court makes inquiries. Financial affidavit reviewed. Court reads Indictment and deft enters plea of not guilty. Statements by counsel re time required for filing pretrial motions. Court makes findings. Gov't moves for detention and deft has no objection at this time. ORDERED: Court appoints counsel on behalf of deft. Pretrial Motions to be filed by 1/13/2020.8 MOTION for Detention is granted as unopposed. Deft to be detained pending further proceedings. (Court Reporter: Recorded) (hbc)
Related: [-]
10 10 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit as to Jennifer MacDonald. (Document image is sealed) (hbc)
Related: [-]
11 11 CRIMINAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER as to Jennifer MacDonald. Motions due by 1/13/2020. Time excluded from 11/14/2019 to 1/13/2020. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 11/14/2019. (hbc)
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Jennifer MacDonald. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 11/14/2019. (hbc)
Related: [-]