California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:19-cr-04166
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2019
Last checked: Friday Nov 15, 2019 11:38 PM PST
Defendant
Jason Hayes (1)
Represented By
Amrutha N. Jindal
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Defendant
William Douglas Jenkins (2)
Represented By
Martha McNab Hall
Diiorio And Hall
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
P. Kevin Mokhtari
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Dec 16 2019
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL in Criminal Case as to Jason Hayes (1), 1, Government's Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice - Granted; William Douglas Jenkins (2), 1, Government's Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice - Granted. Charges pending in case number 19CR3771-H. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/16/19. (dlg)JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL in Criminal Case as to Jason Hayes (1), 1, Government's Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice - Granted; William Douglas Jenkins (2), 1, Government's Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice - Granted. Charges pending in case number 19CR3771-H. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/16/19. (dlg)

Docket last updated: 11/16/2019 1:14 AM PST
Thursday, September 19, 2019
Arrest of Jason Hayes, Bill Douglas Jenkins (no document attached) (vyc) [2:19-mj-10801-RBM]
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs COMPLAINT as to Jason Hayes, Bill Douglas Jenkins. (Copies provided to Counsel in Court). Initial Appearance set for 9/19/2019 in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. Preliminary Hearing set for 10/3/2019 at 1:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. Arraignment set for 10/17/2019 at 1:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. (no document attached) (vyc) (vyc). (vyc). [2:19-mj-10801-RBM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (9/20/2019) Info Sheet Info Sheet
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro: Status Hearing re Initial Appearance as to Jason Hayes, Bill Douglas Jenkins held on 9/19/2019. Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Jason Hayes, Bill Douglas Jenkins: Initial Appearance set for 9/20/2019 in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. Preliminary Hearing set for 10/3/2019 at 1:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. Arraignment set for 10/17/2019 at 1:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. (CD# 9/19/2019 RBM 19 3:39-3:40). (Plaintiff Attorney Rosario Gonzalez). (Defendant Attorney Jo Anne Tyrell). (no document attached) (vyc) [2:19-mj-10801-RBM]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2019
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE P. Kevin Mokhtari appearing for USA. (Mokhtari, P.)Attorney P. Kevin Mokhtari added to party USA(pty:pla) (jmo). [2:19-mj-10801-RBM]
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Bill Douglas Jenkins (smd) [2:19-mj-10801-RBM]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro: Initial Appearance as to Jason Hayes held on 9/20/2019. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Jason Hayes. Bond set as to Jason Hayes (1) No Bail. Government oral motion for detention due to risk of flight. Detention Hearing - RF set for 9/25/2019 at 1:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. Preliminary Hearing set for 10/03/2019 at 1:30pm in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth B. Montenegro. Arraignment set for 10/17/2019 at 1:30pm in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth B. Montenegro. Attorney Federal Defenders for Jason Hayes provisionally appointed. Financial Affidavit to be submitted by next court date. (CD# 9/20/2019 RBM 19 10:52-10:58-2:13-2:13). (Plaintiff Attorney Andrew Chiang). (Defendant Attorney James Johnson). (vyc) [2:19-mj-10801-RBM]
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro: Initial Appearance as to Bill Douglas Jenkins held on 9/20/2019. Appointed Attorney Martha McNab Hall for Bill Douglas Jenkins. Bond set as to Bill Douglas Jenkins (2) No Bail. Government oral motion for detention due to risk of flight. Detention Hearing - RF set for 9/25/2019 at 1:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. Rule 5 objection placed on the record. Defendant presence waived. Preliminary Hearing set for 10/03/2019 at 1:30pm in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth B. Montenegro. Arraignment set for 10/17/2019 at 1:30pm in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth B. Montenegro. True Name as to Bill Douglas Jenkins is William Douglas Jenkins. (CD# 9/20/2019 RBM 19 10:52-10:58-2:13-2:13). (Plaintiff Attorney Andrew Chiang). (Defendant Attorney James Johnson). (vyc) Modified on 9/23/2019 to add Rule 5 objection placed on the record and defendant presence waived. (vyc). [2:19-mj-10801-RBM]
Related: [-]
7 7 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Jason Hayes, Bill Douglas Jenkins (no document attached) (vyc) [2:19-mj-10801-RBM]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORAL MOTION to Detain by USA as to Jason Hayes, William Douglas Jenkins. (no document attached) (vyc) [2:19-mj-10801-RBM]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2019
9 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Amrutha N. Jindal appearing for Jason Hayes (Jindal, Amrutha)Attorney Amrutha N. Jindal added to party Jason Hayes(pty:dft) (jxv). [2:19-mj-10801-RBM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2019
10 10 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jason Hayes (jxv) [2:19-mj-10801-RBM]
Related: [-]
11 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro: Detention Hearing Continued as to William Douglas Jenkins. Defense oral motion to continue hearing granted. Detention Hearing - RF continued to 10/3/2019 01:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. (CD# 9/25/2019 RBM 1:58-2:06). (Plaintiff Attorney Rosario Gonzalez AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Megan Foster sla for Martha Hall CJA). (no document attached) (ccc) [2:19-mj-10801-RBM]
Related: [-]
12 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro: Detention Hearing as to Jason Hayes held on 9/25/2019. USA oral motion for detention; granting 8 Motion to Detain as to Jason Hayes (1). Defendant ordered detained without prejudice. Order of detention to be submitted by AUSA. Financial Affidavit submitted; Court confirms appointment of counsel; PROV Flag cleared. (CD# 9/25/2019 RBM 1:58-2:06). (Plaintiff Attorney Rosario Gonzalez AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Leah Gonzales FD). (no document attached) (ccc) [2:19-mj-10801-RBM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2019
13 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro: Preliminary Hearing not held as to Jason Hayes, William Douglas Jenkins. Defense oral motion to continue hearing granted. Preliminary Hearing continued to 10/17/2019 01:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. (Interpreter Claudia Rubio Samulowitz). (CD# 10/3/2019 RBM 1:53-1:55 & 3:04-3:05 & 1:55-1:56 & 2:11-2:18). (Plaintiff Attorney Nicholas Hernandez AUSA). (Defendant Attorney (1) James Johnson FD, (2) Martha Hall CJA). (ccc) [2:19-mj-10801-RBM]
Related: [-]
14 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro: Detention Hearing as to William Douglas Jenkins held on 10/3/2019. USA oral motion for detention; granting 8 Motion to Detain as to William Douglas Jenkins (2). Defendant ordered detained without prejudice. Order of detention to be submitted by AUSA. (CD# 10/3/2019 RBM 1:53-1:55 & 3:04-3:05 & 1:55-1:56 & 2:11-2:18). (Plaintiff Attorney Nicholas Hernandez AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Martha Hall CJA). (no document attached) (ccc) [2:19-mj-10801-RBM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2019
15 15 1 pgs INFORMATION as to Jason Hayes (1) count(s) 1, William Douglas Jenkins (2) count(s) 1. (dlg) (dsn)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Jason Hayes (dlg) (dsn)
Related: [-]
17 17 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by William Douglas Jenkins (dlg) (dsn)
Related: [-]
18 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro: Arraignment as to Jason Hayes (1) Count 1 and William Douglas Jenkins (2) Count 1 held on 10/17/2019 Not Guilty plea entered. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 11/15/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. The defendant may remain in El Centro and schedule a plea before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. Alternatively, counsel is directed to contact the clerk for Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin if a Change of Plea Hearing needs to be scheduled in San Diego. (CD# 10/17/2019 rbm 210-214; 210-219; 324-326). (Plaintiff Attorney R Gonzalez AUSA). (Defendant Attorney J Tyrell Fd D1 and M Hall CJA D2). (no document attached) (ecs)
Related: [-]