Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34260

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Keith L Phillips
Case #: 3:19-ap-03101
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2019
Terminated:Feb 27, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kendall Aaron Everson Woods
525 Clint Lane
Fredericksburg, VA 22405
Represented By
Kendall Aaron Everson Woods
contact info
Plaintiff
Super Wheels Inc. T/A Fredericksburg Public Auto Auction
239 Warrenton Rd
Fredericksburg, VA 22405
Represented By
Super Wheels Inc. T/A Fredericksburg Public Auto Auction
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Thursday, February 27, 2020
24 24 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Thu 02/27 12:23 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 09, 2020
23 23 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Mon 02/10 12:24 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)21 Order dismissing adversary proceeding
Friday, February 07, 2020
22 22 notice CerDocTyp - Inquiry/General Checksheet BNC Certification of Service Sat 02/08 12:24 AM
Inquiry/General Checksheet BNC Certification of Service Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 17 Inquiry/General Checksheet
21 21 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Court Action) Fri 02/07 11:44 AM
Order Dismissing Complaint and Adversary Proceeding Related [+] (Baumgartner, Cindy) Modified on 2/7/2020 to edit text (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Super Wheels Inc. T/A Fredericksburg Public Auto Auction
Wednesday, February 05, 2020
20 20 court Pre-Trial Conference Cancelled Wed 02/05 2:55 PM
Pre-Trial Conference Cancelled; Moot; Complaint to be Dismissed Related [+]. (rintyep)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Super Wheels Inc. T/A Fredericksburg Public Auto Auction
19 19 court Hearing held Wed 02/05 2:54 PM
Show Cause Hearing held; Complaint to be Dismissed Related [+]. Plaintiff did not appear at hearing. (rintyep)
Related: [-] 14 Order Directing Super Wheels Inc. T/A Fredericksburg Public Auto Auction to Appear
18 18 court Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Wed 02/05 9:20 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing. A copy of this document was mailed by electronic means or first class mail postage prepaid to all parties in interest herein as required by the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rules. Related [+] (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-] related document(s) 17 Inquiry/General Checksheet
17 17 court 4 - Inquiry/General Checksheet Request Wed 02/05 9:19 AM
Inquiry/General Checksheet Issued to Super Wheels Inc. t/a FPAA regarding Requirement of Form or Process; All pleadings, motions and other papers requiredto be served upon a party shall be accompanied by a proof of service signed bycounsel (or pro se party) certifying that copies were served and detailing dateand manner of service. If less than all parties were served, proof of service shallname parties served. [LBR 2002-1(F)]. Related [+] (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-] related document(s)16 Statement filed by Super Wheels Inc. T/A Fredericksburg Public Auto Auction
Monday, February 03, 2020
16 16 misc Statement Wed 02/05 9:12 AM
Statement Request for Waiver of Counsel Requirement Related [+] filed by Super Wheels Inc. T/A Fredericksburg Public Auto Auction. (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-] related document(s)14 Order Directing, Order Continuing/Rescheduling/Setting Hearing
Sunday, January 26, 2020
15 15 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Mon 01/27 1:12 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)14 Order Directing
Friday, January 24, 2020
14 14 order Continuing/Rescheduling/Setting Hearing Fri 01/24 9:56 AM
Order Directing Super Wheels Inc. T/A Fredericksburg Public Auto Auction to Appear, Order Setting Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 2/5/2020 at 09:30 AM at Judge Phillips' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5100, Richmond, Virginia. (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Super Wheels Inc. T/A Fredericksburg Public Auto Auction
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
13 13 court Pre-Trial Conference Continued Thu 01/23 9:41 AM
Pre-Trial Conference Continued; No appearance made by either party Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 02/05/2020 at 09:30 AM at Judge Phillips' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5100, Richmond, Virginia, (rintyep)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Super Wheels Inc. T/A Fredericksburg Public Auto Auction
Saturday, January 18, 2020
12 12 notice CerDocTyp - Notice of Deficient Filing Sun 01/19 12:30 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 11 Notice of Deficient Filing Issued
Thursday, January 16, 2020
11 11 court Deficient Filing Notice Request Thu 01/16 8:16 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing Issued to Super Wheels Inc. T/A Fredericksburg Public Auto Autction regarding Requirement of Counsel: filed on behalf of an entity not a natural person acting on own behalf and not signed by counsel permitted to appear under LBR 2090-1. [See LBR 9010-1] Related [+] Document(s) due by 1/30/2020. (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-] related document(s)9 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet filed by Super Wheels Inc. T/A Fredericksburg Public Auto Auction
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Wed 01/15 3:53 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Super Wheels Inc. T/A Fredericksburg Public Auto Auction. (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-] related document(s) 5 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
9 9 misc Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Wed 01/15 3:50 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Related [+] filed by Super Wheels Inc. T/A Fredericksburg Public Auto Auction. (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Super Wheels Inc. T/A Fredericksburg Public Auto Auction
Friday, November 22, 2019
8 8 notice CerDocTyp - Notice of Deficient Filing Sat 11/23 12:30 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 2 Notice of Deficient Filing Issued
Thursday, November 21, 2019
7 7 notice CerDocTyp - Inquiry/General Checksheet BNC Certification of Service Fri 11/22 12:37 AM
Inquiry/General Checksheet BNC Certification of Service Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 3 Inquiry/General Checksheet
6 6 summon CerDocTyp - Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Fri 11/22 12:37 AM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 5 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Tuesday, November 19, 2019
5 5 summon Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 11/19 3:35 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference. Summons Issued to Kendall Aaron Everson Woods Answer Due 12/19/2019 Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/22/2020 at 09:30 AM at Judge Phillips' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5100, Richmond, Virginia, (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Super Wheels Inc. T/A Fredericksburg Public Auto Auction
4 4 notice Notice to Cure Filing Fee Deficiency Tue 11/19 3:31 PM
Notice to Cure Filing Fee Deficiency Related [+] Filing Fee Due in the amount of $350.00 due by 11/20/2019. (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Super Wheels Inc. T/A Fredericksburg Public Auto Auction
3 3 court 4 - Inquiry/General Checksheet Request Tue 11/19 3:23 PM
Inquiry/General Checksheet Issued to Super Wheels Inc. T/A Fredericksburg Public Auto Auction regarding Requirement of Form or Process; Not accompanied by properly completed Official Form 1040, Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet*. Related [+] (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Super Wheels Inc. T/A Fredericksburg Public Auto Auction
2 2 court Deficient Filing Notice Request Tue 11/19 3:21 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing Issued to Super Wheels Inc. T/A Fredericksburg Public Auto Autction regarding Requirement of Counsel: filed on behalf of an entity not a natural person acting on own behalf and not signed by counsel permitted to appear under LBR 2090-1. [See LBR 9010-1] Related [+] Document(s) due by 12/3/2019. (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Super Wheels Inc. T/A Fredericksburg Public Auto Auction
Friday, November 15, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 11/15 2:37 PM
Adversary case 19-03101 Complaint against Kendall Aaron Everson Woods filed by Super Wheels Inc. T/A Fredericksburg Public Auto Auction. Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34260 (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-]