Martin et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-07572 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Nov 18, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 26, 2022 |
Case in other court: | California Southern, 3:19-cv-02067 |
Last checked: Saturday May 16, 2020 1:41 AM PDT |
Defendant
Bayer A.G.
|
|
Defendant
Does 1-40
|
|
Defendant
Home Depot
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Monsanto Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Derrick Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Martin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, September 15, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Zachary S. Tolson (Tolson, Zachary) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Thu 07/06 1:28 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel must file their own Notice of Appearance using their own ECF Profiles to appear on the docket. Please re-file in its entirety. Re:11 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Home Depot (jrs, COURT STAFF) |
||
Thursday, June 29, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Patricia L. Bonheyo (Bonheyo, Patricia) |
|
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Change of Address by Patricia L. Bonheyo (Bonheyo, Patricia) |
|
Thursday, May 14, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Ruta Valerie Paskevicius (Paskevicius, Ruta) |
|
Wednesday, November 27, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Certificate of Interested Entities by Home Depot identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc., Other Affiliate Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. for Home Depot. (Paskevicius, Ruta) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc., Other Affiliate Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. for Home Depot. (Paskevicius, Ruta) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Ruta Valerie Paskevicius (Jeffrey K. Douglass) (Paskevicius, Ruta) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Ruta Valerie Paskevicius (Robert P. Alpert) (Paskevicius, Ruta) |
|
Tuesday, November 19, 2019 | ||
utility
MDL Member Case
Tue 11/19 2:20 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741-VC; Southern District of California, 19-02067 Martin, et al., opened in California Northern District as 19-07572 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 165 cc: JPMDL (wsnS-adi, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, November 18, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:19-cv-02067. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Wednesday, November 13, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, October 29, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Monday, October 28, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |