Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His C v. Omnia Industries, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-13500
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-13500
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Mary Kay Vyskocil |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01421 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 19, 2019 |
Terminated: | Aug 04, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Omnia Industries, Inc.
5 Cliffside Drive
Cedar Grove, NJ 07009 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 04, 2020 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 08/04 8:25 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1421 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Suarez, Aurea) |
||
Monday, August 03, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation
Mon 08/03 4:39 PM
Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Against Defendant Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Monday, March 30, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Mon 03/30 3:44 PM
Settlement Stipulation Between the Chapter 7 Trustee and Omnia Industries, Inc. Signed on 3/30/2020. (Calderon, Lynda) |
|
Friday, March 27, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice, Hearing
Fri 03/27 4:04 PM
Notice of Hearing /(Hearing Date: 03/31/2020 at 10:00 AM) Notice of Telephonic Hearing filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2020 (check with court for location)(Berger, Neil) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: General Order M-543 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2
Fri 03/27 3:03 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 /Certificate of No Objection to Trustee's Omnibus Application for Orders Approving Settlement Agreements With: (A) Baccarat Inc.; (B) California Faucets, Inc.; (C) Creative Circle, LLC; (D) Impulse! Enterprises, Inc.; (E) Omnia Industries, Inc.; (F) Satco Products, Inc.; (G) Ups Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.; and (H) Wangs Alliance Corporation d/b/a WAC Lighting Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Tuesday, March 17, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice, Hearing
Tue 03/17 4:13 PM
Notice of Hearing /(Hearing Deadline: 3/31/2020 @ 10:00 a.m., Objection Deadline: 3/24/2020 @ 4:00 p.m.) Notice of Hearing to Consider Trustee's Omnibus Application for Orders Approving Settlement Agreements with: (A) Baccarat Inc.; (B) California Faucets, Inc.; (C) Creative Circle, LLC; (D) Impulse! Enterprises, Inc.; (E) Omnia Industries, Inc.; (F) Satco Products, Inc.; (G) Ups Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.; and (H) Wangs Alliance Corporation D/B/A WAC Lighting filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (RG) Objections due by 3/24/2020,(Berger, Neil) |
|
Att: 1 Trustee's Omnibus 9019 Motion | ||
Monday, March 16, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Affidavit of Service
Mon 03/16 1:50 PM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Omnibus Motion to Approve Settlements of Adversary Proceedings Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Wednesday, March 11, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice, Hearing
Wed 03/11 1:24 PM
Notice of Hearing /(Hearing Date: 3/31/2020 @ 10:00 A.M., Objection Deadline: 3/24/2020 @ 4:00 P.M.) Notice of Omnibus Motion to Approve Settlements of Adversary Proceedings filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (RG) Objections due by 3/24/2020, (Berger, Neil) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 02/21 3:59 PM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference (Berger, Neil) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Fri 02/21 10:54 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /(Adjourned Date: 3/31/2020 @ 10:00 A.M.) Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (RG) (Berger, Neil) |
|
Tuesday, January 14, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 01/14 5:06 PM
Affidavit of Service /Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Monday, January 13, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Mon 01/13 3:23 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /(Adjourned Date: 2/19/2020 at 10 A.M.) Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. with hearing to be held on 2/19/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (RG) (Berger, Neil) |
|
Friday, December 27, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
answer
None
Mon 12/30 3:17 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Omnia Industries, Inc.. (Suarez, Aurea) |
|
Wednesday, December 25, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice
Thu 12/26 12:30 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 12/25/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)
Mon 12/23 9:22 AM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil to Judge Robert E. Grossman. (Gomez, Jessica) |
|
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 12/06 10:40 AM
Notice of Appearance /Notice of Appearance of Plaintiff's Counsel and Request for Notice filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Tuesday, November 26, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 11/26 6:47 PM
Affidavit of Service of (I) Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference in an Adversary Proceeding; and (II) Complaint Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Thursday, November 21, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Thu 11/21 3:27 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (MKV), Answer due by 12/23/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Wednesday, November 20, 2019 | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Wed 11/20 2:50 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 19-01421 mkv] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 635. Fee amount 350.00. (Ortiz) |
||
Tuesday, November 19, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Tue 11/19 4:48 PM
Adversary case 19-01421 Complaint against Omnia Industries, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Albert Togut, Albert Togut on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Togut, Albert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Schedule of Transfer |