Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His C v. Nest Fragrances Retail USA, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-13500
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-13500
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Mary Kay Vyskocil |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01422 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 19, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 22, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Nest Fragrances Retail USA, LLC
3 East 54th Street 5th Floor
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 06/22 8:30 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1422 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda) |
||
Friday, June 19, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Fri 06/19 5:47 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Friday, June 12, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
order
Motion, Approve
Fri 06/12 12:31 PM
Settlement Stipulation Signed on 6/12/2020 Between the Chapter 7 Trustee and Nest Fragrances Retail USA, LLC. (Calderon, Lynda) |
|
Thursday, June 11, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2
Thu 06/11 7:35 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 /Certificate of No Objection to Trustee's Third Omnibus Application for Orders Approving Settlement Agreements with: (A) Bethany Lowe Designs, Inc.; (B) Bontempi USA; (C) GlassCrafters Inc.; (D) John Matouk & Co., Inc.; and (E) Nest Fragrances Retail USA, LLC Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Tuesday, May 19, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 05/19 8:12 AM
Affidavit of Service of Trustee's Third Omnibus Application for Orders Approving Settlement Agreements with: (A) Bethany Lowe Designs, Inc.; (B) Bontempi USA; (C) GlassCrafters Inc.; (D) John Matouk & Co., Inc.; and (E) Nest Fragrances Retail USA, LLC Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Monday, May 18, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Motion, Approve
Mon 05/18 4:52 PM
Omnibus Motion to Approve /(Hearing Date: June 16, 2020 at 10:00 a.m., Objection Deadline: June 9, 2020 at 4:00 p.m.) Trustee's Third Omnibus Application for Orders Approving Settlement Agreements with: (A) Bethany Lowe Designs, Inc.; (B) Bontempi USA; (C) GlassCrafters Inc.; (D) John Matouk & Co., Inc.; and (E) Nest Fragrances Retail USA, LLC filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC with hearing to be held on 6/16/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (RG) Responses due by 6/9/2020,. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Bethany Lowe Designs, Inc. Settlement Stipulation | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: Bontempi USA Settlement Stipulation | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3: GlassCrafters Inc. Settlement Stipulation | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4: John Matouk & Co., Inc. Settlement Stipulation | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5: Nest Fragrances Retail USA, LLC Settlement Stipulation | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6: Declaration of Neil Berger | ||
Att: 7 Pleading Notice of Hearing | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit A: General Order M-543 | ||
Friday, March 27, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice, Hearing
Fri 03/27 3:40 PM
Notice of Hearing /(Hearing Date: 03/31/2020 at 10:00 AM) Notice of Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2020 (check with court for location)(Berger, Neil) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: General Order M-543 | ||
Friday, March 20, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation
Fri 03/20 5:06 PM
Stipulation /Sixth Stipulation Extending Answer Deadline Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Wednesday, March 11, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation
Wed 03/11 5:07 PM
Stipulation /Fifth Stipulation Extending Answer Deadline Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation
Wed 02/26 10:15 AM
Stipulation /Fourth Stipulation Extending Answer Deadline Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 02/21 3:59 PM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference (Berger, Neil) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Fri 02/21 10:57 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /(Adjourned Date: 3/31/2020 @ 10:00 A.M.) Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (RG) (Berger, Neil) |
|
Thursday, February 06, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation
Thu 02/06 3:40 PM
Stipulation /Third Stipulation Extending Answer Deadline Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation
Thu 01/16 12:37 PM
Stipulation /Second Stipulation Extending Answer Deadline Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Tuesday, January 14, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 01/14 5:04 PM
Affidavit of Service /Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Monday, January 13, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Mon 01/13 3:20 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /(Adjourned Date: 2/19/2020 at 10 A.M.) Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. with hearing to be held on 2/19/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (RG) (Berger, Neil) |
|
Wednesday, December 25, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice
Thu 12/26 12:30 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 12/25/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation
Mon 12/23 11:02 AM
Stipulation /Stipulation Extending Answer Deadline Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)
Mon 12/23 9:22 AM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil to Judge Robert E. Grossman. (Gomez, Jessica) |
|
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 12/06 10:33 AM
Notice of Appearance /Notice of Appearance of Plaintiff's Counsel and Request for Notice filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Tuesday, November 26, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 11/26 6:39 PM
Affidavit of Service of (I) Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference in an Adversary Proceeding; and (II) Complaint Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Thursday, November 21, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Thu 11/21 3:27 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (MKV), Answer due by 12/23/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Wednesday, November 20, 2019 | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Wed 11/20 2:50 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 19-01422 mkv] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 635. Fee amount 350.00. (Ortiz) |
||
Tuesday, November 19, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Tue 11/19 4:56 PM
Adversary case 19-01422 Complaint against Nest Fragrances Retail USA, LLC (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Albert Togut, Albert Togut on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Togut, Albert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Schedule of Transfer |