Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Jennifer P Wilson
Case #: 1:19-cv-01997
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause05:704 Labor Litigation
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2019
Terminated:Nov 04, 2022
Last checked: Monday May 18, 2020 4:55 AM EDT
Defendant
S-L Distribution Company, LLC
Represented By
Emily C. Reineberg
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Benjamin K Jacobs
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Sari M Alamuddin
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Paul C. Evans
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Benjamin Maranzano
Represented By
Mark J. Gottesfeld
Winebrake & Santillo, LLC
contact info
Harold L. Lichten
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Matthew Thomson
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Peter Winebrake
Winebrake & Santillo, LLC
contact info
R. Andrew Santillo
Winebrake & Santillo, LLC
contact info
Zachary L Rubin
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, November 07, 2022
130 130 misc Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf) Mon 11/07 12:14 PM
COURT REPORTER NOTES OF PROCEEDINGS filed by Wendy Yinger of Fairness Hearing before Judge Wilson on 11/4/2022. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 753(b), I certify that these original notes are a true and correct record of proceedings in the United States District Court for the Middle District of PA before Judge Wilson on 11/4/2022. By s/ Wendy Yinger. (Court Reporter Notes are viewable by court staff only). (Yinger, Wendy)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
129 129 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Certify Class Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 11/04 10:43 AM
ORDER - AND NOW, on this 4th day of November, 2022, in light of the entry of the final order and judgment in this case, Doc. 127, IT IS ORDERED AS FOLLOWS:1. Plaintiffs motion to dismiss the third-party claims, Doc. 61, is DENIED AS MOOT. 2. Plaintiffs motion to certify class, Doc. 62, is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 11/4/2022 (ve)
Related: [-]
128 128 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 11/04 10:41 AM
FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 11/4/2022 (ve)
Related: [-]