Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Matthew W Brann
Case #: 4:19-cv-02001
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2019
Terminated:Mar 27, 2023
Last checked: Monday May 18, 2020 7:11 AM EDT
Defendant
Guthrie Robert Packer Hospital
Represented By
Robert Connell Pugh
Kane, Pugh, Knoell, Troy & Kramer, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Douglas Trostle
Represented By
Robert Connell Pugh
Kane, Pugh, Knoell, Troy & Kramer, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Russ Brown
Represented By
Timothy M. Kolman
Kolman Law P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Robert D. Fanelli
Terminated: 01/22/2020
Represented By
Robert Connell Pugh
Kane, Pugh, Knoell, Troy & Kramer, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Cara Hannigan
Terminated: 01/22/2020
Represented By
Robert Connell Pugh
Kane, Pugh, Knoell, Troy & Kramer, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Erica Skipton
Terminated: 01/22/2020
Represented By
Robert Connell Pugh
Kane, Pugh, Knoell, Troy & Kramer, LLP
contact info

GPO Jan 21 2022
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 53 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Russ Brown. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 1/21/2022. (lg)
GPO Jan 21 2022
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 53 Brown's motion for leave to file an amended complaint is denied without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 1/21/2022. (lg)
GPO Apr 18 2022
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re: 61 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Expert Report filed by Russ Brown. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 4/18/2022. (jr)
GPO Apr 18 2022
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Russ Brown's 61 Motion to Strike the Defendants' Expert Report is DENIED. A telephonic status conference will be scheduled by separate Order. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 4/18/2022. (jr)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, March 27, 2023
102 102 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case (60 Day Settlement Order) Mon 03/27 1:45 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 3/27/2023. (jr)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
order Report of Settlement Officer - Settlement Reached Mon 03/27 10:00 AM
REPORT OF SETTLEMENT OFFICER - Settlement Reached (jw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
100 100 order Verbal Order (Not Ruling on Motions) Tue 03/21 4:43 PM
VERBAL ORDER (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Pretrial Memos, etc. will be rescheduled, if necessary, pending the outcome of the settlement conference. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 3/21/2023. (jr)
Related: [-]
99 99 misc Pretrial Memorandum Tue 03/21 4:19 PM
PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Robert Packer Hospital, Douglas Trostle.(Pugh, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT B,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT C
98 98 trial Proposed Voir Dire Tue 03/21 3:23 PM
Proposed Voir Dire by Robert Packer Hospital, Douglas Trostle. (Pugh, Robert)
Related: [-]
97 97 trial Points for Charge Tue 03/21 3:22 PM
POINTS FOR CHARGE on behalf of Defendants by Robert Packer Hospital, Douglas Trostle.. (Pugh, Robert)
Related: [-]
96 96 misc Letter Tue 03/21 1:58 PM
Letter from Timothy M. Kolman, Esquire Requesting 10 - Day Extension for Pretrial Preparation - Mediation on March 24, 2023 . (Kolman, Timothy)
Related: [-]