New York Southern District Court
Judge:John G Koeltl
Referred: Ronald L Ellis
Case #: 1:14-cv-02103
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Other
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2014
Terminated:Dec 23, 2015
Last checked: Thursday Dec 11, 2014 4:01 PM EST
Defendant
Fabio Perez
50F Stonehurst Boulevard
Freehold, NY 07728
Defendant
Abraham Thomas
Represented By
Nanor L. Terjanian
Wilentz, Goldman & Spitzer, P. A.(nj)
contact info
Maureen S Binetti
Wilentz, Goldman & Spitzer, P. A.(nj)
contact info
Defendant
Universal Business Solutions Inc.
Represented By
Nanor L. Terjanian
Wilentz, Goldman & Spitzer, P. A.(nj)
contact info
Maureen S Binetti
Wilentz, Goldman & Spitzer, P. A.(nj)
contact info
Plaintiff
Melanie Alvarado
Represented By
Derek Todd Smith
Akin & Smith, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, July 20, 2016
44 44 order Stipulation and Order of Dismissal Wed 07/20 3:48 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: The above-entitled action having been adjudicated by and between the parties, it is hereby stipulated and agreed that Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs against any party. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/20/2016) (kgo)
Related: [-]
misc Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Non-ECF Document Error Wed 07/20 8:19 AM
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO EMAIL DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Darren Gelber to E-MAIL Document No. 43 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal to judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. This document is not filed via ECF. (km)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2016
43 43 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 07/19 11:35 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITH prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants and WITHOUT costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Abraham Thomas, Fabio Perez, Universal Business Solutions Inc..(Gelber, Darren)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2016
42 42 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 05/19 7:19 AM
ORDER: The parties are directed to appear for a status conference on June 29, 2016, at 4:30 p.m. ( Status Conference set for 6/29/2016 at 04:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/18/2016) (mro)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Wed 05/18 5:13 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Status Conference held on 5/18/2016. (Fletcher, Donnie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2016
41 41 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 04/14 12:47 PM
ORDER. The parties are directed to appear for a status conference on May 18, 2016 at 4:30 p.m. So ordered. (Status Conference set for 5/18/2016 at 04:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/13/2016) (rjm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 23, 2016
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 03/23 11:42 AM
Minute entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis: Telephone Conference held on 3/23/2016 at 11:30 a.m. (rsh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 17, 2016
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 03/17 12:35 PM
Telephone Conference set for 3/23/2016 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. On the day of the conference, the parties will jointly place a telephone call to the chambers of Judge Ronald L. Ellis, at 212-805-0563. Upon receipt of this order, if you need further information, direct inquiries to Rupa Shah, 212-805-0242. (rsh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2016
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 03/08 10:59 AM
Minute entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis: Telephone Conference held on 3/7/2016 at 3:00 p.m. (rsh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 01, 2016
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 03/01 2:14 PM
Minute entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis: Settlement Conference held on 3/1/2016 at 11:20 a.m. A telephone conference with the attorneys' only shall take place on March 7, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. The conference line is (212)-805-0563. (rsh)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 03/01 2:15 PM
Telephone Conference set for 3/7/2016 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. On the day of the conference, the parties will jointly place a telephone call to the chambers of Judge Ronald L. Ellis, at 212-805-0563. (rsh)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 29, 2016
40 40 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/29 5:46 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Darren M. Gelber on behalf of Abraham Thomas, Universal Business Solutions Inc.. (Gelber, Darren)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 26, 2016
order Endorsed Letter Fri 02/26 12:20 PM
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Willard Shih dated 2/25/16 re: cancelling settlement conference. ENDORSEMENT: DENIED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 2/26/16) (Ellis, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 25, 2016
39 39 misc Letter Thu 02/25 3:08 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Willard C. Shih dated February 25, 2016 re: Adjournment of March 1, 2016 Conference. Document filed by Fabio Perez, Abraham Thomas.(Shih, Willard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 02, 2016
38 38 misc Letter Tue 02/02 3:12 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Darren M. Gelber dated February 2, 2016 re: adjournment request. Document filed by Abraham Thomas, Universal Business Solutions Inc..(Gelber, Darren)
Related: [-]
order Endorsed Letter Tue 02/02 4:48 PM
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Darren Gelber dated 2/2/16 re: adjournment of settlement conference. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 2/2/16) (Ellis, Ronald)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 02/02 4:50 PM
Settlement Conference set for 3/1/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. All counsel must be present. Unless excused by the Court, each party, together with counsel, must appear in person for the conference. If a party is not prepared to go forward with settlement discussions, written notice to the Court is required prior to the conference. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least THREE BUSINESS DAYS before the scheduled conference and only after the parties have consulted with each other. Direct inquiries to Rupa Shah (212)-805-0242. (rsh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 27, 2016
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 01/27 3:35 PM
Settlement Conference set for 2/9/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. All counsel must be present. Unless excused by the Court, each party, together with counsel, must appear in person for the conference. If a party is not prepared to go forward with settlement discussions, written notice to the Court is required prior to the conference. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least THREE BUSINESS DAYS before the scheduled conference and only after the parties have consulted with each other. Direct inquiries to Rupa Shah (212)-805-0242. (rsh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2016
37 37 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 01/26 12:06 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute. Settlement dispute. Referred to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/26/2016) (rjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 25, 2016
36 36 respm Response to Motion Mon 01/25 10:45 AM
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Darren M. Gelber dated January 25, 2016 re:35 LETTER MOTION to Reopen Case and to set a discovery schedule addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Derek Smith dated 1/21/16. . Document filed by Abraham Thomas, Universal Business Solutions Inc.. (Gelber, Darren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2016
35 35 motion Reopen Case Thu 01/21 5:11 PM
LETTER MOTION to Reopen Case and to set a discovery schedule addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Derek Smith dated 1/21/16. Document filed by Melanie Alvarado.(Smith, Derek)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2015
34 34 order Order of Discontinuance ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 12/23 12:52 PM
ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE. It having been reported to this Court that the parties have settled this action, It is, on this 23rd day of December, 2015, hereby ordered that this matter be discontinued with prejudice but without costs; provided, however, that within 30 days of the date of this order, counsel for the plaintiff may apply by letter for restoration of the action to the calendar of the undersigned, in which event the action will be restored. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/23/2015) (rjm)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 04, 2015
minutes Settlement Conference Fri 12/04 4:21 PM
Minute entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis: Settlement Conference held on 12/4/2015 at 11:00 a.m. Case Settled. (rsh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 24, 2015
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/24 5:19 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kush Shukla on behalf of Abraham Thomas, Universal Business Solutions Inc.. (Shukla, Kush)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 06, 2015
32 32 order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Fri 11/06 11:52 AM
ORDER granting31 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Settlement Conference set for 12/3/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. All counsel must be present. Unless excused by the Court, each party, together with counsel, must appear in person for the conference. If a party is not prepared to go forward with settlement discussions, written notice to the Court is required prior to the conference. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least THREE BUSINESS DAYS before the scheduled conference and only after the parties have consulted with each other. Direct inquiries to Rupa Shah (212)-805-0242. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis)(Text Only Order) (Ellis, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 05, 2015
31 31 motion Adjourn Conference Thu 11/05 4:42 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Willard C. Shih dated November 5, 2015. Document filed by Abraham Thomas, Universal Business Solutions Inc..(Shih, Willard)
Related: [-]
30 30 order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Thu 11/05 3:38 PM
ORDER denying29 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis)(Text Only Order) (Ellis, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2015
29 29 motion Adjourn Conference Wed 11/04 1:35 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Willard C. Shih dated November 4, 2015. Document filed by Abraham Thomas, Universal Business Solutions Inc..(Shih, Willard)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 23, 2015
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 10/23 12:11 PM
Settlement Conference set for 11/9/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. All counsel must be present. Unless excused by the Court, each party, together with counsel, must appear in person for the conference. If a party is not prepared to go forward with settlement discussions, written notice to the Court is required prior to the conference. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least THREE BUSINESS DAYS before the scheduled conference and only after the parties have consulted with each other. Direct inquiries to Rupa Shah (212)-805-0242. (rsh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2015
28 28 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 10/22 12:13 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 10/21/2015) (rjm)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Order Thu 10/22 12:10 PM
ORDER. The parties are directed to update the Court on the status of the case after the settlement conference with the magistrate judge. So ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 10/21/2015) (rjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 12, 2015
26 26 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 10/12 10:17 AM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Nanor L. Terjanian dated October 12, 2015 re:23 LETTER MOTION to Reopen Case addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Derek Smith dated October 5, 2015. . Document filed by Abraham Thomas, Universal Business Solutions Inc..(Terjanian, Nanor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affirmation of Nanor L. Terjanian
Friday, October 09, 2015
25 25 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 10/09 3:54 PM
NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: You are directed to appear for a conference, to be held on Wednesday, October 21, 2015, in Courtroom 12B, at 4:30pm in front of the Honorable John G. Koeltl. All requests for adjournments must be made in writing to the Court. For any further information, please contact the Court at (212) 805-0107. Don Fletcher, Courtroom Case Manager. (Conference set for 10/21/2015 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 12B, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl). (rjm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 07, 2015
24 24 order Endorsed Letter ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 10/07 3:58 PM
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Nanor L. Terjanian dated 10/7/2015 re: Request to respond to motion by 10/12/15. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Related [+] (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 10/7/2015) (ajs)
Related: [-] sponses due by 10/12/2015
Monday, October 05, 2015
23 23 motion Reopen Case Mon 10/05 11:11 AM
LETTER MOTION to Reopen Case addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Derek Smith dated October 5, 2015. Document filed by Melanie Alvarado.(Smith, Derek)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2015
22 22 motion Adjourn Conference Thu 07/23 3:13 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for Tuesday, July 28, 2015 addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Nanor L. Terjanian, Esq. dated July 23, 2015. Document filed by Abraham Thomas, Universal Business Solutions Inc..(Terjanian, Nanor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 21, 2015
21 21 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 07/21 5:13 PM
NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: You are directed to appear for a pretrial conference, to be held on Tuesday, July 28, 2015, in Courtroom 12B, at 10:30 a.m., in front of the Honorable John G. Koeltl. All requests for adjournments must be made in writing to the Court. For any further information, please contact the Court at (212) 805-0107. Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 12B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (ajs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 29, 2014
20 20 ORDER granting14 Letter Motion for Conference. The defendants' request for a conference has been granted. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to close Docket No. 14. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/29/2014) (ama)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 18, 2014
19 19 ORDER: This case is stayed, except for service of the summons and complaint on Defendant Fabio Perez, pending resolution of the criminal case. Any party may make an application for the stay to be lifted at any time. The parties should report back to the Court when the criminal case has been resolved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/17/2014) (ama)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 17, 2014
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 6/17/2014. (Fletcher, Donnie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 04, 2014
18 18 ORDER granting17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; granting17 Letter Motion for Conference. Application Granted. Time to move or answer extended to a time to be set at the June 17, 2014 Conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/03/2014) (ama) Modified on 6/10/2014 (ama).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 03, 2014
17 17 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint and Modify May 30, 2014 Letter Motion addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Nanor L. Terjanian dated June 3, 2014., LETTER MOTION for Conference re:14 LETTER MOTION for Conference to Seek Stay of Civil Action Pending Disposition of Criminal Proceedings addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Nanor L. Terjanian dated May 30, 2014. addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Nanor L. Terjanian dated June 3, 2014. Document filed by Abraham Thomas, Universal Business Solutions Inc..(Terjanian, Nanor)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 02, 2014
16 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. Abraham Thomas served on 5/15/2014, answer due 6/5/2014. Service was accepted by Tanya Diaz Office Manager. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Melanie Alvarado. (Smith, Derek)
Related: [-]
15 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. Fabio Perez served on 5/22/2014, answer due 6/12/2014. Service was accepted by "John Doe". Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Melanie Alvarado. (Smith, Derek)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 30, 2014
14 14 LETTER MOTION for Conference to Seek Stay of Civil Action Pending Disposition of Criminal Proceedings addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Nanor L. Terjanian dated May 30, 2014. Document filed by Abraham Thomas, Universal Business Solutions Inc..(Terjanian, Nanor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Letter to Derek Smith dated May 15, 2014,
Att: 2 Exhibit Indictment dated March 29, 2013
Monday, May 05, 2014
13 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending2 Complaint against Abraham Thomas, Universal Business Solutions Inc., Fabio Perez with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Melanie Alvarado. Related document:2 Complaint filed by Melanie Alvarado.(Smith, Derek)
Related: [-]
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT AMENDED COMPLAINT. Notice to Attorney Derek Todd Smith RE: Document No. 12 Amended Complaint, The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party was selected for FILED AGAINST Re-file the document and select the correct party you are filing against. The ALL DEFENDANTS option cannot be chosen, please list each defendant individually. (jd)
Related: [-]
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. The following party has been modified:Fabio Perez.The party has been modified for the following reason(s): Incorrect party role selected. (jom)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2014
12 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending2 Complaint against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Melanie Alvarado. Related document:2 Complaint filed by Melanie Alvarado.(Smith, Derek) Modified on 5/5/2014 (jd).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2014
11 11 ORDER: The plaintiff may file an amended complaint by May 9, 2014, and shall serve the amended complaint promptly thereafter. Another conference is scheduled for June 17, 2014 at 4:30pm. SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/9/2014., Status Conference set for 6/17/2014 at 04:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/29/2014) (ama)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2014
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Pre-Motion Conference held on 4/29/2014. (Fletcher, Donnie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2014
10 10 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:9 Letter, filed by Universal Business Solutions Inc., Abraham Thomas. ENDORSEMENT: ADJOURNED TO TUESDAY, APRIL 29, 2014 AT 4:30 PM. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 4/29/2014 at 04:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet, Part I, on 4/7/2014) (tn)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2014
9 9 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Nanor L. Terjanian dated April 4, 2014 re: Objection to Plaintiff's Request for an Adjournment of Pre-Motion Conference Scheduled for April 14, 2014. Document filed by Abraham Thomas, Universal Business Solutions Inc..(Terjanian, Nanor)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2014
8 8 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:7 Letter filed by Universal Business Solutions Inc., Abraham Thomas. please let this letter serve as a request to remove Maureen S. Binetti of this firm as a CM/ECF notice recipient in this matter. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/03/2014) (ama)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2014
7 7 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Nanor L. Terjanian dated April 2, 2014 re: Request for Removal of CM/ECF Notice Recipient. Document filed by Abraham Thomas, Universal Business Solutions Inc..(Terjanian, Nanor)
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nanor L. Terjanian on behalf of Abraham Thomas, Universal Business Solutions Inc.. (Terjanian, Nanor)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER FOR CERTAIN EMPLOYMENT CASES: This Court is participating in a Pilot Program for INITIAL DISCOVERY PROTOCOLS FOR EMPLOYMENT CASES ALLEGING ADVERSE ACTION, initiated by the Advisory Committee on Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (see "Discovery protocol for employment cases," under "Educational programs and materials," at www.fjc.gov). The Initial Discovery Protocols will apply to all employment cases pending in this court that challenge one or more actions alleged to be adverse, except: And as set forth herein. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/02/2014) (ama)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Letter Motion for Conference. A Conference will be held on Monday, April 14, 2014 at 4:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 4/14/2014 at 04:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/01/2014) (ama)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2014
3 3 LETTER MOTION for Conference regarding Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Nanor L. Terjanian, Esq. dated March 31, 2014. Document filed by Abraham Thomas, Universal Business Solutions Inc..(Binetti, Maureen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2014
2 2 17 pgs COMPLAINT against Abraham Thomas, Universal Business Solutions Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401090833)Document filed by Melanie Alvarado.(js) (jd).
Related: [-]
1 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (js)
Related: [-]
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Abraham Thomas, Universal Business Solutions Inc. (js)
Related: [-]
Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (js)
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF. (js)
Related: [-]
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Derek Todd Smith for noncompliance with Section 14.3 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document 1 Civil Cover Sheet, 2 Complaint to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (js)
Related: [-]