Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His C v. Emtek Products, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-13500
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-13500
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Mary Kay Vyskocil |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01432 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 25, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 30, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Emtek Products, Inc.
15250 E Stafford Street
City of Industry, CA 91744 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 30, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Thu 07/30 11:57 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 07/30 2:44 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1432 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Suarez, Aurea) |
||
Sunday, March 01, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
order
Motion, Approve
Mon 03/02 11:56 AM
Settlement Stipulation Signed on 3/1/2020 Between the Chapter 7 Trustee and Emtek Products, Inc. (Calderon, Lynda) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2
Wed 02/26 2:29 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 /Certificate of No Objection to Trustee's Application for Orders Approving Settlement Agreements With: (A) Emtek Products, Inc.; (B) John Marks Re LLC; (C) Melissa Roth; (D) Matador Photography and Digital Capture, Inc.; and (E) The Whitehurst Company, LLC Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 02/21 3:59 PM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference (Berger, Neil) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Fri 02/21 11:07 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /(Adjourned Date: 3/31/2020 @ 10:00 A.M.) Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (RG) (Berger, Neil) |
|
Monday, February 03, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment
Mon 02/03 7:55 PM
Notice of Presentment /(Presentment Date: 02/24/2020 at 12:00 p.m., Objection Deadline: 02/24/2020 at 11:00 a.m.) Notice of Omnibus Motion to Approve Settlements of Adversary Proceedings filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. with presentment to be held on 2/24/2020 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 501 (RG) Objections due by 2/24/2020, (Berger, Neil) |
|
Friday, January 31, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Motion, Approve
Fri 01/31 12:42 PM
Omnibus Motion to Approve /(Presentment Date: 02/24/2020 at 12:00 p.m., Objection Deadline: 02/24/2020 at 11:00 a.m.) Trustee's Application for Orders Approving Settlement Agreements with: (A) Emtek Products, Inc.; (B) John Marks RE LLC; (C) Melissa Roth; (D) Matador Photography and Digital Capture, Inc.; and (E) The Whitehurst Company, LLC filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Emtek Settlement Agreement | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: John Marks Settlement Agreement | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3: Roth Settlement Agreement | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4: Matador Settlement Agreement | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5: Whitehurst Settlement Agreement | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6: Berger Declaration | ||
Att: 7 Notice of Presentment | ||
Tuesday, January 14, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 01/14 3:50 PM
Affidavit of Service /Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Monday, January 13, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Mon 01/13 2:44 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /(Adjourned Date: 2/19/2020 at 10 A.M.) Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. with hearing to be held on 2/19/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (RG) (Berger, Neil) |
|
Wednesday, December 25, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice
Thu 12/26 12:30 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 12/25/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)
Mon 12/23 9:22 AM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil to Judge Robert E. Grossman. (Gomez, Jessica) |
|
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 12/06 10:03 AM
Notice of Appearance /Notice of Appearance of Plaintiff's Counsel and Request for Notice filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Tuesday, November 26, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 11/26 5:36 PM
Affidavit of Service of (I) Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference in an Adversary Proceeding; and (II) Complaint Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Monday, November 25, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Mon 11/25 3:16 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/22/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (MKV), Answer due by 12/26/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Mon 11/25 10:23 AM
Adversary case 19-01432 Complaint against Emtek Products, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Albert Togut, Albert Togut on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Togut, Albert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Schedule of Transfer |