Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His C v. Mario Luca Giusti
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-13500
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-13500
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Mary Kay Vyskocil |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01433 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 25, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 13, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Mario Luca Giusti
41 Madison Avenue Suite 905
New York, NY 10010 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Monday, April 13, 2020 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 04/13 2:13 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1433 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
||
Friday, April 10, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Certificate of Mailing PDF notice
Sat 04/11 12:23 AM
Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 04/10/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 09, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Certificate of Mailing PDF notice
Fri 04/10 12:17 AM
Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 04/09/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, April 08, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
misc
PDF Notice
Wed 04/08 11:09 AM
Notice of Default Judgment (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
|
21 | 21
order
Judgment
Wed 04/08 11:08 AM
Judgment signed on 4/7/2020. Judgment entered against the Defendant in the principal sum of $6,800.05, plus court filing fees in the amount of $350 with interest. JUDGMENT INDEX NUMBER BC 20,0013 (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
|
Tuesday, April 07, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
misc
PDF Notice
Tue 04/07 10:58 AM
Notice of Default Judgment (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
|
19 | 19
order
Judgment
Tue 04/07 10:56 AM
Judgment signed on 4/7/2020. Judgment entered against the Defendant in the principal sum of $6,800.05, plus court filing fees in the amount of $350 with interest. JUDGMENT INDEX NUMBER BC 20,0013 (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
|
Friday, April 03, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
order
Motion, Default Judgment
Fri 04/03 10:20 AM
Order signed on 4/1/2020 Granting Motion for Default Judgment . (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
|
Friday, March 27, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice, Hearing
Fri 03/27 4:34 PM
Notice of Hearing /(Hearing Date: 03/31/2020 at 10:00 AM) Notice of Telephonic Hearing filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2020 (check with court for location)(Berger, Neil) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: General Order M-543 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2
Fri 03/27 2:28 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 /Certificate of No Objection to Trustee's Application for Entry of an Order Granting Default Judgment Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 03/06 1:10 PM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Hearing to Consider Proposed Order Approving Trustee's Application for Entry of an Order Granting Default Judgment Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Motion, Default Judgment
Fri 03/06 11:26 AM
Motion for Default Judgment /(Hearing Date: 3/31/2020 @ 10:00 A.M., Objection Deadline: 3/24/2020 @ 4:00 P.M.) Trustee's Application for Entry of an Order Granting Default Judgment filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (RG) Responses due by 3/24/2020, (Berger, Neil) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Docket Report | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: Clerk's Entry of Default | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3: Proposed Order | ||
Att: 4 Pleading Notice of Hearing | ||
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 02/21 3:59 PM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference (Berger, Neil) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Fri 02/21 11:09 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /(Adjourned Date: 3/31/2020 @ 10:00 A.M.) Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (RG) (Berger, Neil) |
|
Friday, February 14, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default
Sat 02/15 12:13 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default . Notice Date 02/14/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, February 12, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Clerk's Entry of Default
Wed 02/12 5:04 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against MARIO LUCA GIUSTI, (McCaffrey, Dawn) |
|
Tuesday, January 14, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 01/14 4:54 PM
Affidavit of Service /Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Monday, January 13, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Mon 01/13 3:11 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /(Adjourned Date: 2/19/2020 at 10 A.M.) Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. with hearing to be held on 2/19/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (RG) (Berger, Neil) |
|
Tuesday, January 07, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Affidavit
Tue 01/07 11:02 AM
Affidavit of Neil Berger in Support of Request for a Certificate of Default Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC.(Berger, Neil) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Summons, Complaint, and Affidavit of Service | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: Docket | ||
Wednesday, December 25, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice
Thu 12/26 12:30 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 12/25/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)
Mon 12/23 9:22 AM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil to Judge Robert E. Grossman. (Gomez, Jessica) |
|
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 12/06 10:22 AM
Notice of Appearance /Notice of Appearance of Plaintiff's Counsel and Request for Notice filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Tuesday, November 26, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 11/26 6:30 PM
Affidavit of Service of (I) Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference in an Adversary Proceeding; and (II) Complaint Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Monday, November 25, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Mon 11/25 3:16 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/22/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (MKV), Answer due by 12/26/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Mon 11/25 11:57 AM
Adversary case 19-01433 Complaint against Mario Luca Giusti (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Albert Togut, Albert Togut on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Togut, Albert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Schedule of Transfers | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Mon 11/25 3:18 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 19-01433 mkv] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 635. Fee amount 350.00. (Ortiz) |