Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His C v. Verizon Elan
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-13500
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-13500
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Mary Kay Vyskocil |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01434 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 25, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 14, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Verizon Elan
22001 Loudoun County Parkway
Ashburn, VA 20147 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 19, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Affidavit of Service
Wed 02/19 4:14 PM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Friday, February 14, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Fri 02/14 10:47 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 02/14 12:07 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1434 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Suarez, Aurea) |
||
Thursday, February 06, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation
Thu 02/06 11:06 AM
Stipulation /Third Stipulation Extending Answer Deadline Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation
Wed 01/22 2:54 PM
Stipulation /Second Stipulation Extending Answer Deadline Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Tuesday, January 14, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 01/14 5:12 PM
Affidavit of Service /Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Monday, January 13, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Mon 01/13 3:02 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /(Adjourned Date: 2/19/2020 at 10 A.M.) Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. with hearing to be held on 2/19/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (RG) (Berger, Neil) |
|
Wednesday, December 25, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice
Thu 12/26 12:30 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 12/25/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)
Mon 12/23 9:22 AM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil to Judge Robert E. Grossman. (Gomez, Jessica) |
|
Thursday, December 19, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Thu 12/19 2:07 PM
Stipulation /Stipulation Extending Answer Deadline Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 12/06 10:47 AM
Notice of Appearance /Notice of Appearance of Plaintiff's Counsel and Request for Notice filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Tuesday, November 26, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 11/26 7:09 PM
Affidavit of Service of (I) Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference in an Adversary Proceeding; and (II) Complaint Filed by Neil Matthew Berger on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Berger, Neil) |
|
Monday, November 25, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Mon 11/25 3:16 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/22/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (MKV), Answer due by 12/26/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Mon 11/25 12:14 PM
Adversary case 19-01434 Complaint against Verizon Elan (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Albert Togut, Albert Togut on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Togut, Albert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Schedule of Transfers | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Mon 11/25 3:18 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 19-01434 mkv] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 635. Fee amount 350.00. (Ortiz) |