Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01458

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joseph M Meier
Case #: 1:19-ap-06063
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2019
Terminated:Jun 12, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Christian Care Ministry, a non-profit corporation
4150 W. Eau Gallie Blvd.
Melbourne, FL 32934
Represented By
Christian Care Ministry
contact info
Defendant
Does 1-5
Represented By
Does 1-5
contact info
Plaintiff
Noah G. Hillen, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee for the above-referenced bankruptcy estate
P O Box 6538
Boise, ID 83707
Represented By
Matthew Todd Christensen
Angstman Johnson, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Friday, June 12, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Fri 06/12 1:30 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-6063 Closed (ad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
8 8 motion Notice of Dismissal Wed 06/10 3:49 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff Noah G. Hillen. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
7 7 utility Status Request Tue 06/09 5:13 PM
Request to plaintiff's counsel to provide an update on case status. Status request due date 6/16/2020. (nl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 24, 2020
6 6 trustee Status Report Tue 03/24 5:19 PM
Status Report Filed by Plaintiff Noah G. Hillen. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 09, 2020
5 5 court Notice of Conditional Dismissal (AP) Mon 03/09 12:16 PM
Notice of Conditional Dismissal UPON EXAMINATION of the record herein, the Court finds that cause exists to believe that the parties are NOT diligently prosecuting this adversary case. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that pursuant to Local Rule 7041.1 relating to dismissal in inactive cases, the above entitled case will be DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION unless a party takes further action in accordance with Local Rule 7041.1(a). Stephen W. Kenyon, Clerk of Court This is the Official Notice from the Court. No Document is attached Adversary Action due by 3/30/2020. (dj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2019
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 12/10 4:27 PM
Summons Service Executed on Christian Care Ministry 11/27/2019 (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2019
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 11/25 3:52 PM
Summons Issued on Christian Care Ministry Date Issued 11/25/2019, Answer Due 12/26/2019; Does 1-5 Date Issued 11/25/2019, Answer Due 12/26/2019 (nl)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 11/25 3:22 PM
Receipt of Complaint 19-06063 JMM) ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 7281498. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
utility Fee Due (Create Outstanding Fee) Mon 11/25 3:08 PM
Fee Due Complaint $ 350 Related [+] (lp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Noah G. Hillen
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Mon 11/25 3:09 PM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Per discussion with counsel, fee will be paid and NOT deferred. Related [+] (lp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Noah G. Hillen
Friday, November 22, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/22 4:56 PM
Adversary case 19-06063 13 Related [+]: Complaint by Noah G. Hillen against Christian Care Ministry, Does 1-5. Proposed order on Application to Defer Filing Fee due by: 11/25/2019. (Christensen, Matthew)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Adversary Summons