Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Hala Y Jarbou
Referred: Sally J Berens
Case #: 1:19-cv-01001
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Nov 25, 2019
Last checked: Saturday May 23, 2020 6:29 AM EDT
defendant
Debra Ann Carlson
Represented By
Dale L. Arndt
Straub, Seaman & Allen, P.C.
contact info
mediator
Facilitative Mediator
Represented By
Thomas R. Behm
Gruel Mills Nims & Pylman LLP
contact info
plaintiff
Michael Hoyne
Represented By
Jules B. Olsman
Olsman Mackenzie Peacock & Wallace PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, July 29, 2021
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 07/29 1:51 PM
ORDER granting STIPULATION23 to dismiss; this matter is dismissed with prejudice; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Thu 07/29 9:22 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal by defendant Debra Ann Carlson (Arndt, Dale)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
22 22 order Case Management Order Tue 05/25 2:08 PM
FIRST AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER granting in part and denying in part Parties' First Stipulation for Adjournment of Final Pre-Trial Conference and Jury Trial21 : final pretrial conference set for 10/5/2021 at 11:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; jury trial set for 10/25/2021 at 9:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
21 21 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Mon 05/24 2:43 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Adjournment of Final Pre-Trial Conference & Jury Trial by defendant Debra Ann Carlson (Arndt, Dale)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 13, 2021
20 20 minutes Settlement Conference Thu 05/13 3:08 PM
MINUTES of settlement conference held before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; case did not settle (Proceedings Not Recorded) (jln)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
19 19 misc Restricted Access Court Document Tue 05/04 1:16 PM
(RESTRICTED ACCESS) DOCUMENT Video conference information for 5/13/2021 hearing [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for Debra Ann Carlson, Michael Hoyne only] (jal)
Related: [-]
18 18 2 pgs order Order Regarding Settlement Conference Tue 05/04 11:34 AM
ORDER regarding settlement conference: settlement conference previously set for 5/13/2021 at 02:00 PM for an in-person proceeding is reset by video before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2020
17 17 service Proof of Service Mon 11/02 12:55 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Michael Hoyne for Subpoena with Notice of Taking Deposition upon John Sundstrom (eod)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 28, 2020
16 16 misc Notice Regarding Reassignment (HYJ) Mon 09/28 3:33 PM
NOTICE that this case is reassigned to District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou under[LINK:Administrative Order No. 20-CA-071] ; District Judge Paul L. Maloney is no longer assigned to the case (ndj)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 01, 2020
15 15 trial Witness List Mon 06/01 4:58 PM
Lay & Expert WITNESS LIST by defendant Debra Ann Carlson (Arndt, Dale)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
14 14 adr Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Appointment of Facilitative Mediator Thu 04/23 12:22 PM
NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Thomas R. Behm ; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 4/30/2020 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 4/30/2020 (lep)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 22, 2020
13 13 adr Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Selection of Facilitative Mediator Wed 04/22 9:05 AM
SELECTION of Thomas Behm as facilitative mediator by plaintiff Michael Hoyne (Olsman, Jules)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 21, 2020
adr Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Failure to Select Facilitative Mediator Tue 04/21 8:22 AM
NOTICE that the parties have failed to select a facilitative mediator within the time period prescribed in the case management order; plaintiff shall notify the ADR Administrator of the facilitative mediator selected by April 28, 2020 or the selection will be made by the ADR Administrator (lep)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 01, 2020
12 12 notice Disclosure Statement Wed 04/01 10:08 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Rule 26(a)(1) by defendant Debra Ann Carlson (Arndt, Dale)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 02, 2020
11 11 order Case Management Order Mon 03/02 9:43 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 10/1/2020; dispositive motions due by 12/1/2020; settlement conference set for 5/13/2021 at 02:00 PM at 664 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; final pretrial conference set for 6/14/2021 at 09:00 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; jury trial set for 6/29/2021 at 08:45 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
10 10 minutes Scheduling Conference - Rule 16 By Telephone Thu 02/27 10:33 AM
MINUTES of scheduling conference by telephone held before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; case management order to issue (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (jal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2020
9 9 misc Joint Status Report (Rule 16) Thu 02/20 3:48 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT (Olsman, Jules)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2020
8 8 notice Disclosure Statement Mon 01/20 11:44 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by plaintiff Michael Hoyne (Olsman, Jules)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2020
7 7 4 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Tue 01/14 11:07 AM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 2/26/2020 at 11:00 AM at 650 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; status report due by 2/21/2020; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2020
6 6 notice Notice of Non-Party Fault Fri 01/10 2:14 PM
NOTICE OF NON-PARTY FAULT re Louis Meisch, Grand Haven Dept. of Public Safety and/or Superior Multisport, LLC by defendant Debra Ann Carlson (Arndt, Dale)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/10 2:11 PM
ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand reliance by Debra Ann Carlson (Arndt, Dale) Modified text on 1/10/2020 (ems)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2020
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/07 2:39 PM
SUMMONS returned executed; All Defendants (Olsman, Jules)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2019
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 11/26 9:15 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Debra Ann Carlson (ems)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Tue 11/26 9:12 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ems)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/25 2:40 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Michael Hoyne (Olsman, Jules)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Mon 11/25 2:45 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Michael Hoyne in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4649286 (Olsman, Jules)
Related: [-]