New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Zahid N Quraishi
Case #: 3:19-cv-20700
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Nov 25, 2019
Terminated:Jun 10, 2020
Case in other court:Monmouth County Superior Court, MON-L-32-00019
Last checked: Saturday May 23, 2020 6:19 AM EDT
Defendant
ABC ORGS 1-5
Defendant
HENRY CIRIGNANO
OCEAN COUNTY CORRECTIONS 2926 ADAM STREET
BELMAR, NJ 07719
Represented By
BRIAN E. ANSELL
Ansell Grimm & Aaron, PC
contact info
Defendant
COUNTY OF MONMOUTH
MARKET YARD 33 MECHANIC STREET
FREEHOLD, NJ 07728
Defendant
BRIAN JOGIS
1471 METEDECONK AVENUE
BRICK, NJ 08724
Represented By
JESSICA ANN JANNETTI
Office Of The Attorney General Of Nj
contact info
JESSICA ANN SAMPOLI
Office Of The Attorney General Of Nj
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-5
Defendant
STATE OF NEW JERSEY
RICHARD J. HUGHES JUSTICE COMPLEX 25 MARKET STREET
TRENTON, NJ 08611
Represented By
JESSICA ANN JANNETTI
Office Of The Attorney General Of Nj
contact info
JESSICA ANN SAMPOLI
Office Of The Attorney General Of Nj
contact info
Defendant
NEW JERSEY OFFICE OF PROBATION SERVICES MONMOUTH COUNTY VICINAGE
2407 NJ-66
OCEAN TOWNSHIP, NJ 07712
Represented By
JESSICA ANN JANNETTI
Office Of The Attorney General Of Nj
contact info
JESSICA ANN SAMPOLI
Office Of The Attorney General Of Nj
contact info
Plaintiff
VIKTORIA MIKIRTUMOVA
ZLATA RUDIKH 223 HIGHWAY 18 SOUTH SUITE 204
EAST BRUNSWICK, NJ 08816
Represented By
YAN RUDIKH
contact info
ZLATA RUDIKH
Rudikh & Associates LLC
contact info
JORDAN B. RICKARDS
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, August 25, 2020
31 31 misc Mail Returned Tue 08/25 3:59 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to YAN RUDIKH (abr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 11, 2020
30 30 1 pgs order Order Tue 08/11 2:08 PM
ORDER of dismissal that this matter is dismissed with prejudice and without costs. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/11/2020. (abr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
29 29 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Wed 06/10 2:17 PM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 8/10/2020. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 6/10/2020. (gxh)
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Wed 06/10 2:12 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi: Settlement Conference held on 6/10/2020. (kas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 21, 2020
28 28 order Order on Oral Motion Tue 04/21 1:54 PM
TEXT ORDER: Parties are to submit ex parte settlement memos to the Court electronically (to znq_orders@njd.uscourts.gov) by 5/20/2020. Settlement conference conducted via telephone is hereby scheduled for 6/10/2020 at 11:00 a.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 4/21/2020. (kas)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 04/21 1:09 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi: Telephone Conference held on 4/21/2020. (kas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 08, 2020
27 27 order Order on Oral Motion Wed 04/08 10:10 AM
TEXT ORDER: A telephone status call is hereby scheduled for 4/21/2020 at 12:30 p.m. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 4/8/2020. (kas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 07, 2020
26 26 1 pgs misc Letter Tue 04/07 2:20 PM
Letter from Rickards, Jordan. (RICKARDS, JORDAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 31, 2020
25 25 6 pgs misc Mail Returned Tue 03/31 1:13 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Yan Rudikh (abr)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2020
24 24 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 02/28 9:07 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part8 Motion to Stay; Discovery is hereby stayed as to Cirignano until 45 days after he is sentenced; Cirignano must file a letter within 7 days of his sentencing, informing the Court that he has been sentenced and specifying the date of his sentencing.Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 2/27/2020. (abr)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2020
23 23 1 pgs misc Letter Mon 02/24 4:04 PM
Letter from Brian E. Ansell, Esquire. (ANSELL, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs misc Letter Mon 02/24 3:11 PM
Letter from Jordan B. Rickards. (RICKARDS, JORDAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
21 21 1 pgs misc Mail Returned Thu 02/20 8:34 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Yan Rudikh (abr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, February 04, 2020
20 20 1 pgs order Order Tue 02/04 2:20 PM
LETTER ORDER that parties are to submit status letter to the Court in 2 weeks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 2/4/2020. (abr)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2020
19 19 1 pgs misc Letter Mon 02/03 3:51 PM
Letter from Jordan Rickards. (RICKARDS, JORDAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
18 18 1 pgs misc Notice to Counsel re mandatory eFiling Wed 01/22 3:10 PM
Notice to YAN RUDIKH re mandatory eFiling. (abr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2020
17 17 order Order on Oral Motion Fri 01/10 3:51 PM
TEXT ORDER: Status letter to the Court due no later than 1/31/2020. SO Ordered by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 1/10/2020. (kas)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 01/10 3:49 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi: Telephone Conference held on 1/10/2020. (kas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2020
16 16 1 pgs order Order Tue 01/07 10:35 AM
LETTER ORDER Rule 16 Conference was consented to a telephone conference to take place on 1/10/20 at 10am. No Joint Discovery plan is requested to be submitted prior to the conference call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 1/7/2020. (abr)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2020
15 15 1 pgs misc Letter Mon 01/06 11:30 AM
Letter. (RICKARDS, JORDAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2020
14 14 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/03 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JORDAN B. RICKARDS on behalf of VIKTORIA MIKIRTUMOVA (RICKARDS, JORDAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2020
13 13 order Order on Oral Motion Thu 01/02 10:00 AM
TEXT ORDER: The initial conference scheduled for 1/10/2020 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby CONVERTED to a telephone status call. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 1/2/2020. (kas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2019
12 12 1 pgs misc Mail Returned Tue 12/31 11:27 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Yan Rudikh (eaj)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2019
11 11 1 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 12/20 10:45 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by HENRY CIRIGNANO re8 First MOTION to Stay Proceedings (ANSELL, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2019
10 10 2 pgs respm Certification in Opposition to Motion Wed 12/18 9:24 AM
CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by VIKTORIA MIKIRTUMOVA re8 First MOTION to Stay Proceedings (RUDIKH, ZLATA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2019
8 8 2 pgs motion Stay Thu 12/12 1:48 PM
First MOTION to Stay Proceedings by HENRY CIRIGNANO.(ANSELL, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 8 pgs Memorandum of Law,
Att: 3 2 pgs Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 12/12 4:07 PM
Set Deadlines as to8 First MOTION to Stay Proceedings . Motion set for 1/6/2020 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2019
9 9 6 pgs misc Mail Returned Thu 12/12 4:43 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to YAN RUDIKH. (jem)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2019
7 7 2 pgs misc Statement Tue 12/03 2:33 PM
STATEMENT of Damages Claimed by All Plaintiffs. (RUDIKH, ZLATA)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/03 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ZLATA RUDIKH on behalf of All Plaintiffs (RUDIKH, ZLATA)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2019
5 5 46 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/02 4:44 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BRIAN JOGIS, NEW JERSEY OFFICE OF PROBATION SERVICES MONMOUTH COUNTY VICINAGE, STATE OF NEW JERSEY.(JANNETTI, JESSICA)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/02 11:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN E. ANSELL on behalf of HENRY CIRIGNANO (ANSELL, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/02 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN E. ANSELL on behalf of HENRY CIRIGNANO (ANSELL, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2019
2 2 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 11/27 10:31 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2020 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7W before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/27/2019. (km)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2019
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 11/26 10:06 AM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2019
1 1 117 pgs notice Notice of Removal Mon 11/25 4:17 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, BRIAN JOGIS, NEW JERSEY OFFICE OF PROBATION SERVICES MONMOUTH COUNTY from Monmouth County Superior Court, case number MON-L-3732-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10137854), filed by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, BRIAN JOGIS, NEW JERSEY OFFICE OF PROBATION SERVICES MONMOUTH COUNTY.(JANNETTI, JESSICA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Certificate of Service