Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity v. Gracious Management LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-13500
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-13500
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Mary Kay Vyskocil |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01436 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Nov 26, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 16, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Gracious Management LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 16, 2021 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 03/16 11:23 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1436 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Barrett, Chantel) |
||
Monday, March 15, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Mon 03/15 8:57 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by John R. Ashmead on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Ashmead, John) |
|
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice
Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Sunday, February 28, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)
Sun 02/28 10:31 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Robert E. Grossman to Judge Lisa G. Beckerman. (Gomez, Jessica) |
|
Tuesday, January 14, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Tue 01/14 1:49 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference filed by John R. Ashmead on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. with hearing to be held on 2/19/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (RG) (Ashmead, John) |
|
Tuesday, December 31, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 12/31 9:28 PM
Affidavit of Service of (I) Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference in an Adversary Proceeding; and (II) Amended Complaint Filed by Catherine V. LoTempio on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (LoTempio, Catherine) |
|
Wednesday, December 25, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice
Thu 12/26 12:30 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 12/25/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)
Mon 12/23 9:22 AM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil to Judge Robert E. Grossman. (Gomez, Jessica) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Fri 12/13 4:52 PM
Amended Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (MKV), Answer due by 1/13/2020, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Fri 12/13 3:59 PM
Request for a Amended Summons filed by John R. Ashmead on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Ashmead, John) |
||
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 12/09 11:02 AM
Amended Complaint against Gracious Management LLC Filed by John R. Ashmead on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Ashmead, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Wednesday, November 27, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Wed 11/27 10:23 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/22/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (MKV), Answer due by 12/27/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Tuesday, November 26, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Tue 11/26 12:06 PM
Adversary case 19-01436 Complaint against Gracious Management LLC (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by John R. Ashmead on behalf of Albert Togut, Not Individually But Solely in His Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Gracious Home LLC. (Ashmead, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B |